New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:24-bk-21708
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
58 Ocean Avenue LLC
2003 E 5th St
Brooklyn, NY 11223
Represented By
Jenee K. Ciccarelli
Wenarsky And Goldstein, LLC
contact info
Scott J. Goldstein
Law Offices Of Wenarsky And Goldstein, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 10:28 AM EDT
Creditor
Fifty Eight Ocean Ave LLC
35 Journal Square 4th Floor
Jersey City, NJ 07306
Represented By
Edward D Altabet
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Aladekemi Omoregie
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Realtor
Adele Cohen
Leventer Real Estate Inc 260 Norwood Avenue
Deal, NJ 07723
Spec. Counsel
Scott J. Goldstein
Law Offices of Wenarsky and Goldstein, 410 State Route 10 West Suite 214
Ledgewood, NJ 07852
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Samantha Lieb
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
50 50 2 pgs motion File Amended Proof of Claim Tue 04/22 3:08 PM
Motion to File Amended Proof of Claim Filed by Edward D Altabet on behalf of Fifty Eight Ocean Ave LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM, Zoom-Judge Kaplan: join.zoom.us Meeting ID 160 546 2580, Passcode 962296, or call 1-646-828-7666.. (Altabet, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Attorney Certification
Att: 2 Exhibit Note with Alonge
Att: 3 Exhibit Mortgage, Security Agreement, Fixture Filing
Att: 4 Exhibit Assignment of MSA
Att: 5 Exhibit Assignment of Leases and Rents
Att: 6 Exhibit Loan Agreement
Att: 7 Exhibit UCC Financing Statement
Att: 8 Exhibit Aff. of Bus. Purposes
Att: 9 Exhibit Foreclosure Judgment
Att: 10 Exhibit Assignment of Judgment
Att: 11 Exhibit Writ of Execution
Att: 12 Exhibit Letter to Sheriff with Notice of Upset Price
Att: 13 Exhibit Notice of 10/24 Sheriff's Sale
Att: 14 Exhibit Notice of Adjournment of Sheriff's Sale
Att: 15 Exhibit Rivera Aff/Schedule of Amount Due (5.1.24)
Att: 16 Exhibit Amended Proof of Claim
Att: 17 Proposed Order
Att: 18 Certificate of Service
Att: 19 Memorandum of Law Omnibus Memo re Am. Proof of Claim and Objects to Disclosure Statement/Plan
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
49 49 14 pgs answer Objection Wed 04/16 9:21 AM
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Related [+] filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Lieb, Samantha)
Related: [-] 29 Disclosure Statement Filed by Jenee K. Ciccarelli on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Listing Agreement # 2 Proof of Funds) filed by Debtor 58 Ocean Avenue LLC,30 Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Jenee K. Ciccarelli on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by Debtor 58 Ocean Avenue LLC