South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 8:24-cv-06899
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Case in other court:McCormick County Court of Common Pleas, 2024-CP-35-00097
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 7:00 AM EST
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche Pa (gree)
contact info
Defendant
Truist Bank
Represented By
Shelton Sterling Laney, III
Womble Bond Dickinson (gre)
contact info
John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Womble Bond Dickinson (co)
contact info
Jason David Wyman
Womble Bond Dickinson (gre)
contact info
Plaintiff
Geralyn Nichols
Represented By
John D Harrell
Harrell Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/30 12:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Truist Bank by Geralyn Nichols. (Harrell, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 01/21 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Geralyn Nichols (Harrell, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/14 1:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Truist Bank.(Wyman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/08 3:35 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Tuesday, February 11, 2025 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/8/25. (alew)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 3:24 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/28/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/24/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/18/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/19/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/9/2025, Discovery due by 7/7/2025, Motions due by 7/21/2025, Mediation Due by 8/4/2025, Motion in Limine due by 9/5/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/15/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 10/6/2025. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/8/25. (alew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/31 10:00 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/18 1:20 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 12 motion for extension of time. Defendant Truist Bank's responsive pleading is due by January 14, 2025. Entered by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr on 12/18/24. (alma, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/17 10:09 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by Truist Bank. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wyman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/03 11:34 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 9 motion for extension of time. Defendant Equifax's responsive pleading is due by January 2, 2025. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/3/24.(alew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 12/02 2:59 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/02 2:58 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by Equifax Information Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 12/02 2:15 PM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Geralyn Nichols.(Harrell, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John D Harrell on behalf of Geralyn Nichols (Harrell, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Extending Time to Answer Tue 11/26 4:10 PM
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Truist Bank answer due 12/24/2024. (Wyman, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Other Tue 11/26 1:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal. (alew)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 11/26 1:33 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Truist Bank.(alew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 11/26 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McCormick County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-CP 35-00097 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12127147), filed by Truist Bank.(alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Consent to Removal