Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Howard F Sachs
Case #: 4:24-cv-00780
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 4:04 AM CST
Defendant
Caesar's Entertainment, Inc.
Plaintiff
Aaron Abadi
82 Nassau Street Apt. 140 Ste 140
New York, NY 10038


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
5 5 respoth Response to order Tue 12/24 10:49 PM
RESPONSE to order re4 Order to Show Cause,, on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Abadi. Related [+] (Abadi, Aaron)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Affidavit IFP Affidavit - Long Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh A - Win Loss _ MGM Resorts - 2024,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh B - caesars.com_myrewards_profile_winloss,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh C - Caesars No activity,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh D - My Dashboard - Unity by Hard Rock,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh E - Citibank Statement,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh F - Geico Bill Statement,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh G - Google Fi Wireless,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh H - Statement of Benefit from public Assistance
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
4 4 7 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 12/18 1:33 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall Show Cause in writing by January 3, 2025 why his motion to proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied. Plaintiff is further directed to file an update4d AO Form 239 on or before January 3, 2025 . Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending submission of the required financial disclosures and response to this Order. Signed on 12/18/24 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 order Letter of reassignment Fri 12/13 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris to District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Judge Morris no longer assigned to this case. Please note the new case number: 24-780-CV-W-HFS. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
2 2 misc Financial Affidavit Tue 12/03 4:19 PM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Aaron Abadi. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/03 4:17 PM
Pro Se MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Aaron Abadi. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Woods, Gloria) (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 51 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 (12/3/2024) Envelope
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Tue 12/03 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 12/26/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Mailed a paper copy of the Magistrate Consent form to the Pro Se Plaintiff with instructions to complete and return ASAP. Mailed to Aaron Abadi, 82 Nassau Street, Apt. 140, New York, NY 10038.(Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]