Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12711

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:24-bk-12715
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Feb 19, 2025
Claims Deadline:Mar 19, 2025
Converted:Jan 08, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Kilburn Live LLC
11333 Iowa Ave
Los Angeles, CA 90025-4214
Represented By
Mark W. Eckard
Raines Feldman Littrell, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David W. Carickhoff
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP 1313 N. Market Street Suite 5400
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 04/01/2025 8:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
court Case Assigned Tue 12/03 7:41 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (SH)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 12/03 7:04 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Kilburn Live LLC. (Eckard, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 12/03 7:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12715 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11921000, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 11 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Tue 12/03 9:27 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Cinema Pop-ups LLC, KH FEC LLC, KL Holdco LLC, Kilburn Blaster LLC, Kilburn Experiences 3, LLC, Kilburn Experiences LLC, Kilburn Live LLC, Kilburn PE LLC, Kilburn PE Middle East, LLC, Kilburn Perceptual, LLC, Kilburn Toybox LLC, Night Garden LLC, PR Live LLC, The Game Room FEC, LLC. (Eckard, Mark)
Related: [-]