Minnesota District Court
Judge:Laura M Provinzino
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:24-cv-04386
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 3:34 AM CST
Defendant
Shantel Sundby
Plaintiff
Valerie Steiner
P.O. Box 17370 Lot 5074
St. Paul, MN 55117


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 12/26 10:11 AM
JUDGMENT(ACH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Friday, December 20, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/20 2:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction;2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Laura M. Provinzino on 12/20/2024. (TJC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
2 2 motion Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP) Thu 12/05 5:12 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Valerie Steiner. (ABR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/05 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Shantel Sundby filed by Valerie Steiner. Case assigned to Judge Laura M. Provinzino per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (ABR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet