New York Southern District Court
Judge:Victor Marrero
Case #: 1:24-cv-09305
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Emeritus Institute of Management PTE LTD
Defendant
Emeritus Institute of Management, Inc.
Represented By
Jessica Rubin Caterina
Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP
contact info
Jeffrey M. Eilender
Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Prysm Group, LLC
30 N. Gould Street Suite R
Sheridan, WY 82801
Represented By
Gavin Purcell Lentz
Bochetto & Lentz
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/22 3:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending3 Complaint, against Emeritus Institute of Management PTE LTD, Emeritus Institute of Management, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC. Related document:3 Complaint,..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - redacted,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - redacted,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 3:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE granting16 Motion for Ryan T. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Ryan T. Kirk for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/17/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 12:30 PM
MOTION for Ryan T. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30939729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Kirk, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 04/16 1:05 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Ryan T. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30939729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 order Memo Endorsement Tue 04/01 3:03 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:14 Letter, filed by Prysm Group, LLC ENDORSEMENT The Court hereby grants Plaintiff leave to amend the Complaint to name Emeritus Singapore and Emeritus US as two separate defendants. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/1/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Mon 03/31 10:45 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gavin P. Lentz, Esquire dated March 31, 2025 re: Response to Judge Victor Marrero's Order dated March 21, 2025. Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/21 10:44 AM
ORDER Plaintiff is directed to submit a letter explaining the proposed amendment to the Complaint within ten (10) days of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/21/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
12 12 misc Status Report Wed 03/19 3:00 PM
STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 03/13 3:58 PM
ORDER The parties are directed to file a status report indicating whether further proceedings are contemplated and showing cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The parties shall submit the status report no later than March 19, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/13/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 01/07 3:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Emeritus Institute of Management, Inc. served on 12/19/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proof of Service
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Rubin Caterina on behalf of Emeritus Institute of Management, Inc...(Caterina, Jessica)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M. Eilender on behalf of Emeritus Institute of Management, Inc...(Eilender, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 12/20 9:45 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emeritus Institute of Management PTE LTD..(gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/19 9:24 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emeritus Institute of Management PTE LTD d/b/a Emeritus Institute of Management, Inc., re:3 Complaint,. Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/12 11:17 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
4 4 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/09 11:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
3 3 15 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Emeritus Institute of Management PTE LTD d/b/a Emeritus Institute of Management, Inc.. Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D Redacted,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E Redacted,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/09 9:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/09 9:33 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/09 9:33 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 12/09 9:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gavin Purcell Lentz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $35,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 12/09 9:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gavin Purcell Lentz to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/09 11:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gavin Purcell Lentz to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/06 12:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 12:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30290460)Document filed by Prysm Group, LLC..(Lentz, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F