California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-10521
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24SMCV03335
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 1:26 AM PST
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Karen Liao
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Petya Ivanova Hrabar
Manning And Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Lumpkin
Represented By
Juan C Victoria
Mcnicholas And Mcnicholas LLP
contact info
Richard William Esposito Powers
Mcnicholas And Mcnicholas, LLP
contact info
Matthew S McNicholas
Mcnicholas And Mcnicholas LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/28 4:55 PM
ORDER RE: CIVIL JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Jury Trial set for 2/23/2026 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 2/6/2026 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 5/2/2025. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 1/23/2026. Last Date to Hear Motions 2/6/2026. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 12/15/2025. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 2/2/2026. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 2/9/2026. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 02/25 2:08 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/15/2025. (dta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 02/20 9:46 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the 2/21/2025, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 02/07 4:54 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7days, filed by Plaintiff Donald Lumpkin.. (Esposito Powers, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 12/19 3:25 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 12/19 3:23 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 12/16 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-10521 AB(SKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
7 7 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Mon 12/16 10:59 AM
Declination of Consent form received on 12/13/2024 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 12/10 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 12/06 12:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., re Notice (Other)3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on 12/6/2024. (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/06 12:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/06 12:46 PM
Notice filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. Notice to Adverse Party of Filing Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court [28 U.S.C.1441(b)] (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 12/06 12:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/06 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24SMCV03335 Receipt No: ACACDC-38708551 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Attorney Karen Liao added to party HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.(pty:dft))(Liao, Karen)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 12/10 2:25 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Donald Lumpkin in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/10/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 12/10 2:29 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/4/2024, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
Related: [-]