1
|
|
1
38
pgs
COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Cynthia Song in violation of 18:1956(h). Approved by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Cynthia Song (1). (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
1
pgs
FINDINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Cynthia Song. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Cynthia Song; defendants Year of Birth: 1981; date of arrest: 10/25/2024. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Cynthia Song. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Cynthia Song. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Contested detention hearing held. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Jacquelyn Sara Marrinson for Cynthia Song, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Government's request for detention is granted. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/12/2024 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 11/18/2024 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Court Smart: CS 10/28/2024. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Cynthia Song is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on November 12, 2024 at 11:30 am and for Post Indictment Arraignment on November 18, 2024 at 11:30 am before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Cynthia Song. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Cynthia Song. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Defendant Cynthia Song (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Cynthia Song. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
1
pgs
ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDING Issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Cynthia Song. recommended that the defendant be Marshal to alert facility of daily meds. (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for RELIEVING THE OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER AND APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL Filed by Defendant Cynthia Song. (Marrinson, Jacquelyn) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
14
|
|
14
1
pgs
ORDER RELIEVING THE OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER AND APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting13 APPLICATION for Order for as to Cynthia Song (1) (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michael V. Severo in place of attorney Jacquelyn Marrinson Filed by Defendant Cynthia Song. (Severo, Michael) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
16
|
|
16
Corrected REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michael V. Severo in place of attorney Jacquelyn Marrinson Filed by Defendant Cynthia Song. (Severo, Michael) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order (CORRECTED)
|
17
|
|
17
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)15 , Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)16 filed by Defendant Cynthia Song (Severo, Michael) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michael V. Severo in place of attorney Charles C. Brown Filed by Defendant Cynthia Song. (Severo, Michael) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
20
|
|
20
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: granting18 REQUEST for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Attorney Michael Vincent Severo for Cynthia Song added. Attorney Charles C. Brown terminated. as to Cynthia Song (1) (jb) [2:24-mj-06544-DUTY]
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
16
pgs
INDICTMENT Filed as to Cynthia Song (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Andrew M Roach as to Defendant Cynthia Song; defendants Year of Birth: 1981 USMS# REG 43639-511 (mhe)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
1
pgs
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Cynthia Song Related Case(s): 2:24-CR-00386-SB (mhe)
Related: [-]
|