Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Referred: Timothy P O'Hara
Case #: 1:24-cv-03403
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78 Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 2:46 AM MST
Defendant
Ian G. Bell
Represented By
Austin Glenn Miller
contact info
Harvey Abe Steinberg
Springer & Steinberg PC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Christopher Everett Martin
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 03/26 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 03/26/2025. The Court grants Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer [ECF23 ]. The new deadline for Defendant to file a response is May 12, 2025.(ggill, )
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order Referring Motion Wed 03/26 10:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Ian G. Bell. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/26/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 03/26 8:45 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Ian G. Bell. (Miller, Austin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/24 8:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 03/24/2025. The Court grants the Motion [ECF20 ] by Christopher E. Martin, Esq. to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiff. The Court notes that Jodanna L. Haskins, Esq. will continue to represent Plaintiff.(ggill, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 order Order Referring Motion Fri 03/21 2:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/21/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/21 2:00 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Martin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jodanna Lissette Haskins on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange CommissionAttorney Jodanna Lissette Haskins added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Haskins, Jodanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 03/12 12:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 03/12/2025. The Motion [ECF16 ] is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference, currently set for March 19, 2025, at 1:30 p.m., and its associated deadlines are VACATED. After ruling on the Motion to Intervene and Stay [ECF14 ], the Court will sua sponte reset the Scheduling Conference if necessary.(ggill, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
17 17 order Order Referring Motion Tue 03/11 4:39 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR COURT TO CONDUCT THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/11/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/11 4:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR COURT TO CONDUCT THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Martin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
15 15 order Order Referring Motion Thu 03/06 5:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 14 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene and Stay filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/6/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Intervene Thu 03/06 1:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Intervene and Stay by Intervenor Plaintiff THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Brown, Logan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, February 06, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 02/06 2:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 02/06/2025. Before the Court is Defendant's "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer" [ECF11 ]. For good cause shown, and noting that Plaintiff is unopposed, the motion [ECF11 ] is GRANTED. The Court EXTENDS Defendant's deadline to respond by 45 days from the original February 10 deadline. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond on or before March 27, 2025.(ggill, )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Referring Motion Thu 02/06 12:56 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Ian G. Bell. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/6/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 02/06 11:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Ian G. Bell. (Miller, Austin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
10 10 order Minute Order Tue 01/21 4:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 01/21/2025. Pursuant to the Order of Reference, the Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on March 19, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. This will be an in-person proceeding. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) jointly email a Word copy of the proposed Scheduling Order, copying all Parties, to Chambers at[LINK:o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] . (ggill, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 01/17 9:21 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Austin Glenn Miller on behalf of Ian G. BellAttorney Austin Glenn Miller added to party Ian G. Bell(pty:dft) (Miller, Austin)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 01/17 9:20 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Harvey Abe Steinberg on behalf of Ian G. BellAttorney Harvey Abe Steinberg added to party Ian G. Bell(pty:dft) (Steinberg, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Case Association Wed 12/18 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Christopher Everett Martin on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Martin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 12/12 9:58 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Ian G. Bell waiver sent on 12/11/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Martin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/10 1:32 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 12/10/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Tue 12/10 10:29 AM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. All future pleading shall be designated 24-cv-03403-RMR . Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 misc Summons Issued Mon 12/09 3:36 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (agryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 12/09 3:36 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Ian G. Bell Attorney Christopher Everett Martin added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(Martin, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons