California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:24-bk-11398
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Dismissed:Feb 05, 2025
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
1203 S Sespe St
Fillmore, CA 93015-9767
Represented By
Reed H Olmstead
Law Offices Of Reed H. Olmstead
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
32 32 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (Chapter 11) (No PDF) Tue 02/25 9:52 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (Chapter 11) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND). (Fittipaldi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
31 31 court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 02/20 8:06 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced bankruptcy case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, the bond is exonerated, and this case is therefore closed. (ES9)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
30 30 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 02/12 9:51 AM
Hearing Vacated- Order dismissing case entered 2/05/2025 at docket #26 . Related [+] (ES9)
Related: [-] #20 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case
Friday, February 07, 2025
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/07 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF)
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 02/07 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 25. Notice Date 02/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Notice of dismissal (BNC)
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
27 27 misc Notice of dismissal (BNC) Wed 02/05 3:41 PM
Notice of dismissal (BNC) (SM)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/05 3:41 PM
Order Dismissing Case After Status Conference - Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 2/5/2025 Related [+]. (SM)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1),20 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND)
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
25 25 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 02/05 9:16 AM
Hearing Held- Case dismissed. The Court will issue its own order. Related [+] (ES9)
Related: [-] STATUS CONFERENCE related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
24 24 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 01/29 6:35 PM
Hearing Held 01/29/2025 at 1:00 p.m. re: Chapter 11 Status Conference (Bk Other) Related [+] - Continued to February 4, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 5D in Santa Ana. The Debtor shall provide evidence of insurance on all properties to the U.S. trustee and the other interested parties by January 31, 2025, at 5:00 p.m. (SM)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 01/29 6:36 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/04/2025 at 09:00 AM Ronald Reagan Federal Bldg 411 W Fourth St Crtrm 5D Santa Ana, CA 92701 for1 , (SM)
Related: [-] 1 VOLUNTARY PETITION (CHAPTER 11) filed by Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
Friday, January 24, 2025
23 23 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 01/24 1:49 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Kelly, Sweeney. (Kelly, Sweeney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
22 22 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 01/22 10:04 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (SM)
Related: [-] 20 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND)
21 21 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 01/22 9:53 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/11/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Ronald A Clifford, III (SM)
Related: [-] 20 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND)
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 103 pgs motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Tue 01/21 8:41 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case; memorandum of points and authorities; declaration of Maria D. Marquez in support thereof with proof of service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND). (Fittipaldi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
19 19 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 01/17 11:07 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Mechanics Bank, successor by merger to Rabobank, N.A. Filed by Kennedy, Matthew. (Kennedy, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
18 18 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 01/07 9:49 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Cameron Schlagel Filed by Creditor Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.. (Schlagel, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
17 17 misc Request for special notice Thu 01/02 11:46 AM
Request for special notice Filed by Creditor Tulare County Tax Collector . (ES9)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
16 16 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 12/26 8:17 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Documents filed without holographic signature of authorized representative of debtor, Guadalupe Guzman. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Related [+] (SM)
Related: [-] 14 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1), Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum), Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B), Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D), Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F), Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G), Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H), Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207) (Official Form 107 or 207), Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030), Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1)
15 15 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 12/26 8:08 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Docket event was incorrectly selected for filings requiring no filing fee, however, the document filed indicates that a filing fee is due. It appears several creditors are being added (examples: Fay Servicing, Mechanics Bank, and Mid Valley Financial) please comply with LBR 1007-1(c) and LBR 1007-1(a)(4) and resubmit amended creditors using the mandatory form F1007-1.1AMENDEDSUMMARY with a supplemental master mailing list and the appropriate docket code: Amended List of Creditors (Fee). CREDITORS WILL NOT BE ADDED UNTIL THESE STEPS ARE TAKEN. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT FEE DOCKET EVENT. Related [+] (ES9)
Related: [-] 14 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1), Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum), Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B), Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D), Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F), Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G), Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H), Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207) (Official Form 107 or 207), Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030), Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1)
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
14 14 64 pgs misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Tue 12/24 8:55 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches. (Olmstead, Reed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Wed 12/18 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Request for a Certified Copy Tue 12/17 10:50 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :reed@olmstead.law: Filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches Related [+]. (Olmstead, Reed)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 12/17 10:50 PM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:9:24-bk-11398-RC] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57806259. Fee amount 12.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 12
Saturday, December 14, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/14 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Friday, December 13, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 12/13 11:17 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:9:24-bk-11398] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57787692. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, December 12, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/12 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Thu 12/12 2:24 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/7/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/10/2025. (BH)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for special notice Thu 12/12 12:04 PM
Request for special notice And Inclusion in Master Mailing List [Bankruptcy Rule 2002] Filed by Creditor Farm Credit West, FLCA. (Keller, Ivo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 12/10 3:20 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document. Incorrect/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. The PDF contains different image sizes. The filer is instructed to re-file the document to include the same dimensions of each page. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY (USE DOCKET CODE: ADDENDUM TO VOL PET; Click on Bankruptcy Events, BK - Other, Addendum to Vol Pet). Related [+] (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Tue 12/10 12:57 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/29/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Ronald A Clifford, III (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
3 3 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 12/10 12:56 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (Date: January 29, 2025, Time: 1:00 p.m.) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 12/10/2024 Related [+]. (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 12/10 12:44 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made: Case is not deficient for Schedule C and Corporate Ownership Statement. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 12/10 10:51 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Santa Paula Hay & Grain and Ranches List of Equity Security Holders due 12/24/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 12/24/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 12/24/2024. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 12/24/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 12/24/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 12/24/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 12/24/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 12/24/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 12/24/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 12/24/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 12/24/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 12/24/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 12/24/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 12/24/2024. (Olmstead, Reed)
Related: [-]