Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:24-cv-03580
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1441 Removal-Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:48 AM EST
Defendant
Howard County Fire and Rescue Services
2201 Warwick Way
Marriotsville, MD 21104
Represented By
DeNisha A Watson
Howard County Office Of Law
contact info
Tsega Girma Kyere
Howard County Office Of Law
contact info
Gary W Kuc
Howard County Office Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Howard County, Maryland
SERVE ON: Gary W. Kuc, County Solicitor George Howard Building 3450 Court House Drive
Ellicott City, MD 21043
Represented By
DeNisha A Watson
Howard County Office Of Law
contact info
Tsega Girma Kyere
Howard County Office Of Law
contact info
Gary W Kuc
Howard County Office Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Levy
Represented By
Seema Morse
The Law Office Of Seema Morse LLC
contact info
Kathlynne T Ramirez
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 11:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Levy Cert of Discovery (Ramirez, Kathlynne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 03/19 11:19 AM
QC NOTICE:14 Notice (Other) filed by Mark Levy was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 4:52 PM
NOTICE by Mark Levy 26(a)(2) INITIAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES (Ramirez, Kathlynne)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 02/03 11:38 AM
ORDER Granting12 Joint Motion to Modify Initial Scheduling Order and Initial Report; Status Report due 07/30/2025. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/3/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
12 12 motion Amend/Correct Fri 01/31 5:52 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Scheduling Order and Initial Report by Howard County, Maryland, Howard County Fire and Rescue Services(Watson, DeNisha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/17 9:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/2/2025. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/17/2025.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Informal Discovery Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 4:58 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Howard County, Maryland, Howard County Fire and Rescue Services.(Watson, DeNisha)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/30 3:27 PM
ORDER Granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/30/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/30 3:15 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Howard County, Maryland, Howard County Fire and Rescue Services(Watson, DeNisha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
7 7 misc Supplement Fri 12/20 12:52 PM
Supplement to3 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Howard County, Maryland, Howard County Fire and Rescue Services (Kyere, Tsega)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tsega Girma Kyere on behalf of All Defendants (Kyere, Tsega)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
5 5 misc Supplement Tue 12/17 3:05 PM
Supplement to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Howard County, Maryland, Howard County Fire and Rescue Services Circuit Court Docket (Watson, DeNisha)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 3:02 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Howard County, Maryland, Howard County Fire and Rescue Services (Watson, DeNisha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
3 3 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Thu 12/12 4:57 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 4:52 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Howard County Fire and Rescue Services and Howard County, Maryland, filed by Mark Levy.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 12/11 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Howard County, case number C-13-CV-24-000850. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11657186), filed by Howard County Fire and Rescue Services, Howard County, Maryland.(Watson, DeNisha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Summons for Circuit Court,
Att: 2 Complaint for Circuit Court
utility Remark - State Court Docs Thu 12/12 4:54 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HOWARD COUNTY, MARYLAND. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]