Utah District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00101
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 11:28 AM MST
Defendant
Tiffany Ann Herron (2)
Represented By
Ryan D. Stout
Douglas D Terry & Assc
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Allen Savage (1)
Represented By
Matt A. Munson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph M. Hood
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/25/2024 11:30 AM MST
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
1 1 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Matthew Allen Savage (1) count(s) 1, Tiffany Ann Herron (2) count(s) 1. Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (bmr)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Matthew Allen Savage. Initial Appearance set for 12/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Room 2B 206 (St George) before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/10/2024.(jlh)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Tiffany Ann Herron. Initial Appearance set for 12/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Room 2B 206 (St George) before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/10/2024.(jlh)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued Electronically in case as to Matthew Allen Savage. (bmr) Modified unsealed as executed/dft appeared on 12/16/2024 (mh).
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued Electronically in case as to Tiffany Ann Herron. (bmr) Modified unsealed as dft has appeared on 12/16/2024 (mh).
Related: [-]
7 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF HOLDING COURT in St. George by USA as to Matthew Allen Savage, Tiffany Ann Herron (bmr)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Matthew Allen Savage.(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
9 9 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Tiffany Ann Herron.(Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
10 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler as to Matthew Allen Savage, Tiffany Ann Herron under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/10/2024.(mjm)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs ORDER granting 8 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Matthew Allen Savage (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/10/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Matthew Allen Savage for 12/16/2024 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (jlh)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Tiffany Ann Herron (2) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/10/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Tiffany Ann Herron for 12/16/2024 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (jlh)
Related: [-]