Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:24-cv-00278
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
CauseFamily and Medical Leave Act of 1993 (FMLA of 1993)
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
ABC Business Entities 1-20
Defendant
Augusta University
Defendant
Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Defendant
John/Jane Does 1-10
Defendant
Shiloh Moorehead
Defendant
Alyce Oliver
Defendant
Michelle Torres
Defendant
Wellstar MCG Health
Plaintiff
Jessica Gosse
Represented By
Melissa Renza
Lento Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 respoth Response Fri 04/25 5:48 AM
RESPONSE to3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Jessica Gosse. Related [+] Modified on 4/25/2025 (csr)
Related: [-] nza, Melissa
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 04/18 8:35 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge recommending this case be dismissed. Within 14 days of service, any party may file written objections to this R&R. (Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2025.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/17/2025. (amd)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 04/18 8:32 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Ms. Renza should not be subject to disciplinary proceedings. Ms. Renza is directed to respond to this Order by 4/25/2025. (Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2025.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/17/2025. (amd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 04/02 11:40 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why her case should not be dismissed for her failure to timely serve any defendant. Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/2/2025. (maa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
2 2 order Rule 26(f) Order Thu 12/12 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. ([LINK:Click Here to View Standing Order)] RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/12/2024. (amd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Statement
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT against ABC Business Entities 1-20, Augusta University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, John/Jane Does 1-10, Shiloh Moorehead, Alyce Oliver, Michelle Torres, Wellstar MCG Health, filed by Jessica Gosse.(amd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 12/12 4:31 PM
Filing fee: $405.00, receipt number AGASDC-3954095. (amd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel (CLR Forms) Thu 12/12 4:41 PM
Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (amd)
Related: [-]