Oregon District Court
Judge:Andrew D Hallman
Case #: 2:24-cv-02062
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 1:47 AM PST
Defendant
J and B Properties, LLC
Defendant
Patawa Rentals, LLC
Defendant
Robert Alan Property Management, Inc.
Defendant
James Jeffrey Swearingen
Plaintiff
Alexxis Auriel Weeks
Represented By
Zachary R. Duffly
Duffly Law, LLC
contact info
Talia Yasmeen Guerriero
Beacon Employment Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/07 2:47 PM
Answer to11 Amended Complaint Answer to Robert Alan Property Management Counter/Cross Claims, and Affirmative Defense . Filed by Patawa Rentals, LLC, James Jeffrey Swearingen, J and B Properties, LLC. (Bolster, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 04/03 12:48 PM
Notice of Appearance of Justin Bolster, Molly M. Stoecklin appearing on behalf of Patawa Rentals, LLC, James Jeffrey Swearingen . Filed by on behalf of Patawa Rentals, LLC, James Jeffrey Swearingen. (Bolster, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
12 12 order 1 - Scheduling Wed 03/19 10:47 AM
Scheduling Order. Telephone Rule 16 Conference is set for 6/11/2025 at 08:30AM in Pendleton by telephone before Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry.) Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to Hallman_CRD@ord.uscourts.gov, or file a discovery plan anytime before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Tue 03/18 5:55 PM
First Amended Complaint . Filed by Alexxis Auriel Weeks against All Defendants. (Guerriero, Talia)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/14 12:37 PM
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time9 to File Response to Defendant Robert Alan Property Management, Inc. Answer, Affirmative Defense, Cross Claim. Response due March 18, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/13 3:21 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Def. Robert Alan's Answer, Affirmative Defense & Cross Claims . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guerriero, Talia)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Mon 02/10 4:27 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, , Crossclaim Robert Alan Property Management, Inc.. Filed by Robert Alan Property Management, Inc.. (Murphy, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 01/27 3:55 PM
Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,3 upon Robert Alan Property Management, Inc. served on 1/20/2025, answer due on 2/10/2025 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guerriero, Talia)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 01/27 3:54 PM
Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,3 upon Patawa Rentals, LLC served on 1/20/2025, answer due on 2/10/2025 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guerriero, Talia)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 01/27 3:53 PM
Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,3 upon J and B Properties, LLC served on 1/20/2025, answer due on 2/10/2025 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guerriero, Talia)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Mon 01/27 3:52 PM
Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,3 upon James Jeffrey Swearingen served on 1/20/2025, answer due on 2/10/2025 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guerriero, Talia)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 12/13 12:20 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to J and B Properties, LLC, Patawa Rentals, LLC, Robert Alan Property Management, Inc., James Jeffrey Swearingen. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 12/13 12:18 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/14/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/12/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 5/12/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrew D. Hallman. (gd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 11:58 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9679171 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Alexxis Auriel Weeks against All Defendants. (Guerriero, Talia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Swearingen,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons J&B,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Patawa,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Robert Alan