Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 1:24-cv-00531
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
7 7 misc Letter Thu 04/10 2:47 PM
Letter from Charles Lee Dewey III regarding address and filing fee. (Copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se party) (sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/01 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address from Noble County Jail to Reception Diagnosis Center per DE 14 in case 1:24-cv-508. IFP order and financial ledger sent to RDC as directed in order. (nae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Wed 01/08 2:06 PM
Copy of3 Order and Ledger mailed to Noble County Jail. (ash)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 01/08 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Charles Lee Dewey, III from Allen County Jail to Noble County Jail.(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, December 19, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/20 10:29 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF2 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Charles Lee Dewey III, IDOC #301115, Allen County Jail #630656, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $27.33 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/19/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Allen County Jail)(ely)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/12 2:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Charles Lee Dewey, III. (sej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Thu 12/12 2:14 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Nurse Brandy, Officer Husin, filed by Charles Lee Dewey, III. (File stamped copy of complaint and docket sheet mailed to Dewey) (sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Envelope