Colorado District Court
Judge:Robert E Blackburn
Referred: N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:24-cv-03451
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 2:00 AM MST
Defendant
John Fox
3030 Glasgow Road
Bowling Green, KY 42101
Defendant
Roberta Gillette
2710 Sunnyside Road
Montrose, CO 81401
Defendant
Teresa Ross
117 Pebble Drive
Glasgow, KY 42141
Defendant
Roberta (I) Gillette
Plaintiff
Daniel Todd
Represented By
Patrick Edward Gillette
Reynolds Gillette LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ingrid Todd
Represented By
Patrick Edward Gillette
Reynolds Gillette LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
33 33 answer Answer to Crossclaim Fri 04/18 3:39 PM
ANSWER to21 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , CROSSCLAIM Counter-Crossclaim against John Fox, Teresa Ross by Roberta Gillette, Roberta (I) Gillette.(Stevenson, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Order to Pay),
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Sale of Assets),
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C (Withdrawal of Assets),
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D (Return of Check)
Thursday, April 17, 2025
32 32 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Fri 04/18 9:50 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:27 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan L. Stein. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. Also, please include contact information. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (ggill, )
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Fri 04/18 9:48 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:26 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan L. Stein. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. Also, please include contact information. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (ggill, ) Modified on 4/18/2025 to correct spelling of name (ggill, )
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 04/17 3:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to John Fox and Teresa Ross's Counterclaims (ECF No.28 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall answer or otherwise respond to Defendants John Fox and Teresa Ross's Counterclaims (ECF No.21 ) on or before April 24, 2025. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/17/2025. PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED ORDER. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
29 29 order Memorandum Thu 04/17 3:16 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re21 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by Ingrid Todd, Daniel Todd. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/17/2025. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 04/17 2:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re21 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Plaintiffs Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd, Cross Defendants Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd, Counter Defendants Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd. (Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/17 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Jonathan L. Stein - Amended by Stephen Morgan Whitmore on behalf of John Fox, Teresa Ross (Whitmore, Stephen)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/17 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jonathan L. Stein by Stephen Morgan Whitmore on behalf of John Fox, Teresa Ross (Whitmore, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 04/14 10:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , First COUNTERCLAIM against Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd by Roberta Gillette, Roberta (I) Gillette.(Stevenson, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 04/01 10:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/1/2025. Defendant Roberta Gillette's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Interpleader Complaint (ECF No.22 ) is GRANTED. Ms. Gillette is given a 14-day extension of time in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Interpleader Complaint (ECF No.1 ). PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
23 23 order Memorandum Mon 03/31 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Interpleader Complaint filed by Roberta (I) Gillette, Roberta Gillette. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/31/2025. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Mon 03/31 2:33 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Interpleader Complaint by Defendants Roberta (I) Gillette, Roberta Gillette, Cross Defendants Roberta Gillette, Roberta (I) Gillette. (Stevenson, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Fri 03/28 2:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Stephen Morgan Whitmore added to party John Fox(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Morgan Whitmore added to party Teresa Ross(pty:dft), CROSSCLAIM against Roberta Gillette, Roberta (I) Gillette, Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd by John Fox, Teresa Ross.(Whitmore, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 03/12 8:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/12/2025. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Continue March 19, 2025 Scheduling/Planning Conference (ECF No.18 ) is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for March 19, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to May 29, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before May 20, 2025. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
19 19 order Memorandum Wed 03/12 8:06 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue March 19, 2025, Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by Ingrid Todd, Daniel Todd. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/12/2025. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 motion Continue Tue 03/11 7:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue March 19, 2025, Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiffs Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd. (Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 03/04 3:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd. John Fox waiver sent on 1/30/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 03/04 3:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd. Teresa Ross waiver sent on 1/30/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
15 15 misc Affidavit Thu 02/20 4:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Plaintiffs Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd. (Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 misc Receipt Thu 02/13 10:46 AM
RECEIPT for Non-Cash Collateral: 144 Gold Coins, 140 Silver Coins re:13 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds,, (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Mon 02/10 4:51 PM
ORDER FOR DEPOSIT OF PROPERTY Upon consideration of the Motion, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: A. Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No.6 ) is GRANTED. B. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall deposit the Coins with the Court Clerk, who shall inventory and provide Plaintiffs with a receipt for the Coins. C. The Coins shall be held by the Clerk of Court pending further judicial determination of how, when, and to whom the Coins should be distributed. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/10/2025.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 misc Summons Issued Thu 02/06 12:23 PM
SUMMONS as to Roberta Gillette issued by Clerk. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
11 11 misc Summons Request Thu 01/30 8:39 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to ROBERTA GILLETTE by Plaintiffs Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd. (Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 minutes Status Conference Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Mon 01/27 4:22 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 1/27/2025. The Motion for Order Authorizing the Deposit of Property into the Courts Registry (Dkt. #6 ) is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom A401. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference Wed 01/15 3:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER Interpleader Plaintiffs' Request for Forthwith Status Conference (ECF No.7 ) is GRANTED as follows. A telephonic Status Conference is set for January 27, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/15/2025.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 order Memorandum Tue 01/14 12:13 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding7 First MOTION for Hearing/Conference filed by Ingrid Todd, Daniel Todd,6 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Ingrid Todd, Daniel Todd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/14/2025. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 motion Hearing/Conference Mon 01/13 7:39 PM
First MOTION for Hearing/Conference by Plaintiffs Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd. (Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 motion Deposit Funds Mon 12/16 5:04 PM
MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiffs Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd.(Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion for Order Authorizing Deposit of Property into the Court's Registry
Friday, December 13, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/13 3:43 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/13/2024. The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter pursuant to the Order Referring Case, entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on December 13, 2024 (Dkt. # 4 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall promptly serve Defendants. A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: March 19, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# . If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered (norlin, )
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/13 1:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/13/2024. Text Only Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] bsec
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 12/13 8:49 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thursday, December 12, 2024
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 12/13 8:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 10:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10035948)Attorney Patrick Edward Gillette added to party Daniel Todd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Edward Gillette added to party Ingrid Todd(pty:pla), filed by Daniel Todd, Ingrid Todd.(Gillette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - Roberta Gillette,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - John Fox,
Att: 4 Summons Summons - Teresa Ross