NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-13188
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-13188
Washington Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Timothy W Dore |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-13189 |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC
19321 59th Ave NE
Arlington, WA 98223-6356 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
court
Creditors Uploaded
Tue 01/28 8:31 AM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 1 creditor(s). (admin) |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases . Lead Case: 24-13188 NW Custom Aircraft Hangars LLC Member Case(s) 24-13189 NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC , and 24-13190 Duane Wilcoxon : . (MT) |
|
32 | 32
![]() |
|
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Proof of Service . Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. . (Palmer, Steven) |
|
30 | 30
![]() Motion for Consolidation (Administrative) previously filed and ordered in Case No. 24-13188 .. Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
29 | 29
![]() Pre-Status Conference Report. Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. . (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
court
US Trustee's Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Held
Wed 01/15 10:27 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors as concluded. Filed by Benjamin Teich on behalf of United States Trustee. (Teich, Benjamin) |
||
Wednesday, January 08, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing . Filed by Michael M Sperry on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Sperry, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER Granting Debtor's Application to Employ Karr Tuttle Campbell as Counsel for Debtor . (MT) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
25 | 25
ans
Declaration of No Objection (text only)
Mon 01/06 10:12 AM
Declaration of No Objection. The Filer represents to the Court that Notice of the Motion linked to this entry was served on 12/17/2024 in accordance with applicable rules and the proof of service filed and that no objection to that Motion has been filed in the Office of the Clerk or received by the Filer. ... Filed by Steven M Palmer of Karr Tuttle Campbell on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
court
Minutes - Hearing Not Held LBR 9013 cw
Mon 01/06 11:04 AM
Minutes. Hearing Date: 1/10/2025. Declaration of no objection submitted. Order to be received pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1(f)(2). . Hearing not held. (SAS) |
||
Monday, December 30, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Change of Address for Fred L & Kimberly Osterhout, Kenneth & Merry Youderian Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, December 24, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Proof of Service . Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. . (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Saturday, December 21, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 12/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER Granting Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Continued Use of Pre-Petition Bank Accounts . (CMK) |
|
20 | 20
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [12/20/2024 09:31:32 AM]. File Size [ 544 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:18 ]. (Emergency Motion Continued Use of Pre-Petition Bank Accounts. Proof of Service.). (admin) |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
court
Minutes - Hearing Held cw
Fri 12/20 11:25 AM
Minutes. Hearing Date: 12/20/2024 . Appearances: Benjamin Teich on behalf of United States Trustee; Daniel Hagen on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing, LLC. . Motion is granted. Moving party to submit order. (SAS) |
||
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Letter From Attorney to Judge: Non-Appearance Notice . Filed by Michael S DeLeo on behalf of Michael S DeLeo. . (DeLeo, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
![]() 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Sent to BNC for Mailing . (MT) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 12/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
trustee
US Trustee's Setting Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Business (BNC)
Wed 12/18 3:47 PM
Meeting of Creditors Business Filed by Benjamin Teich on behalf of United States Trustee. With 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/14/2025 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic Creditors Meeting Chapter 11. Complaint Deadline: 3/17/2025. (Teich, Benjamin) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Proof of Service . Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. . (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER Setting Status Conference and Deadline to File Proof of Claims. Status hearing is scheduled for 1/31/2025 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dore's Seattle Courtroom 8106, U.S. Courthouse. Pre-Status Conference Report 1/17/2025. Proof of Claims due by 1/29/2025. (MT)Modified to add Pre-Status Conference Report Date on 12/17/2024 (MT) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ORDER Granting Debtor's Motion to Shorten Time . The Hearing date is set for 12/20/2024 at 09:30 AM at Judge Dore's Seattle Courtroom 8106, U.S. Courthouse. (MT) |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time on Debtor's Motion for Continued Use of Pre-Petition Bank Accounts . Proof of Service. Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC The Hearing date is set for 12/17/2024 at 09:30 AM at Judge Dore's Seattle Courtroom 8106, U.S. Courthouse. Response due by 12/17/2024. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() Emergency Motion Continued Use of Pre-Petition Bank Accounts . Proof of Service. Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC The Hearing date is set for 12/20/2024 at 09:30 AM at Judge Dore's Seattle Courtroom 8106, U.S. Courthouse. Response due by 12/20/2024. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Federal Tax Documents for the Year for 2022 - PDF viewable by court only. Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Application to Employ Karr Tuttle Campbell as Counsel for Debtor . Proof of Service. Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC The Hearing date is set for 1/10/2025 at 09:30 AM at Judge Dore's Seattle Courtroom 8106, U.S. Courthouse. Response due by 1/3/2025. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Declaration re: Balance sheet, statement of operations, cash flow statement ... Filed by Steven M Palmer of Karr Tuttle Campbell on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing LLC. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Appointment of Trustee Michael S. DeLeo by the United States Trustee Filed by Benjamin Teich on behalf of United States Trustee.(Teich, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Adequate Filing
Tue 12/17 1:29 PM
Adequate Filing . (MT) |
||
court
Minutes - Hearing Not Held cw
Tue 12/17 3:01 PM
Minutes. Hearing Date: 12/17/2024. ORDER Granting Debtor's Motion to Shorten Time (ECF No. 12) docketed. . The Hearing date is set for 12/20/2024 at 09:30 AM at Judge Dore's Seattle Courtroom 8106, U.S. Courthouse. (SAS) |
||
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Benjamin Teich on behalf of United States Trustee. (Teich, Benjamin) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Deficient Filing . (MT) |
|
Saturday, December 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed.. Filed by Steven M Palmer on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing, LLC. (Palmer, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual. Ch 11 Small Business Plan Subchapter V due by 03/14/2025, Filed by Steven M Palmer of Karr Tuttle Campbell on behalf of NW Custom Aircraft Hangars Leasing, LLC (Palmer, Steven) |
|
court
Creditors Uploaded
Mon 12/16 6:02 AM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 15 creditor(s). (admin) |