Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:W Scott Hardy
Case #: 2:24-cv-01704
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Property Damage
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 5:23 AM EST
Defendant
GEORGE MOVING AND STORAGE, INC.
Represented By
Keanna Adinae Seabrooks
Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES STECKEL
69 Whitney Ave.
Morris Planes, NJ 07950
Represented By
William E Stockey
Stockey & Kelly
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA STECKEL
69 Whitney Ave.
Morris Planes, NJ 07950
Represented By
William E Stockey
Stockey & Kelly
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/18 9:38 AM
ORDER approving6 Joint Stipulation with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a). The Clerk of Court is to mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/18/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Mon 02/17 12:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a) (jointly filed) by GEORGE MOVING AND STORAGE, INC.. (Wescoe, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 order Order Thu 02/06 3:55 PM
ORDER indicating that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(b), Defendant is directed to file on the docket in this case, any and all documents previously filed in this case in the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/6/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 12/18 10:06 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by GEORGE MOVING AND STORAGE, INC. (Seabrooks, Keanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
3 3 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 12/17 2:18 PM
Errata re1 Notice of Removal, by GEORGE MOVING AND STORAGE, INC.. Reason for Correction: changing the basis for removal to federal question and adding plaintiff's city and state. (Foreman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 12/17 9:26 AM
Errata re1 Notice of Removal, by GEORGE MOVING AND STORAGE, INC. Reason for Correction: Uploading Civil Cover Sheet to Initial Removal Documents. (Seabrooks, Keanna) Document removed from public view and refiled as an Errata at3 . Modified text on 12/17/2024. (kss)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Duplicate Case Tue 12/17 7:46 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Duplicate cases opened. CORRECTION: Duplicate Case No. 2:23-cv-1703 deleted. In event of error in case opening process, filer is to contact the Clerk's Office. Filer IS NOT to open successive case numbers. (cww)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/17 8:22 AM
Judge W. Scott Hardy added. (kss)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement QC - Attorney added without signing any pleadings Tue 12/17 8:31 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A).(Disclosure Statement due by 12/24/2024.) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Attorney added as counsel of record without signing any pleadings. CORRECTION: Attorney James A. Wescoe must file a Notice of Appearance. (kss) QC message corrected due to Errata at3 changing jurisdiction. Modified text on 12/17/2024. (kss)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No Civil Cover Sheet Attached Tue 12/17 9:20 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Civil Cover Sheet missing the county for the plaintiffs. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a corrected civil cover sheet by using the Errata event and linking it to the initiating document. (kss)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No Civil Cover Sheet Attached Tue 12/17 10:23 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Errata. ERROR: Civil Cover Sheet missing the county for the plaintiffs. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a corrected civil cover sheet by using the Errata event and linking it to the initiating document (kss)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required) Mon 12/16 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-24-003636. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8610151), filed by George Moving and Storage Inc. (Seabrooks, Keanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit