California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-10923
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 12:56 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Pasadena Star LLC
Defendant
Peace of Green, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mister Bailey
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
18 18 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Wed 03/05 8:47 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Peace of Green, Inc. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
17 17 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 03/03 1:06 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Peace of Green, Inc. filed by plaintiff Mister Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/04 1:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mister Bailey, upon Defendant Peace of Green, Inc. served on 1/30/2025, answer due 2/20/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon EFREN GONZALEZ, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 01/30 3:54 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Pasadena Star LLC (lom)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 01/30 9:59 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Pasadena Star LLC filed by plaintiff Mister Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 01/28 3:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mister Bailey, upon Defendant Pasadena Star LLC served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DAVID M. NEMAN, AS MANAGER in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 01/23 3:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Having considered Plaintiff's response, [Dkt. No. 11], the Court finds that exercise of supplemental jurisdiction is not warranted. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act and related state law claims. The Court therefore dismisses these claims without prejudice. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 misc Response Wed 01/22 11:01 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Mister Baileyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, January 13, 2025
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 01/13 4:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause in ten (10) days. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 18 pgs order Order Mon 12/23 3:43 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/19 12:10 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Pasadena Star LLC, Peace of Green, Inc. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 12/19 12:09 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 12/19 12:08 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 12/19 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 12/19 11:44 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Mister Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 12/19 11:43 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 12/19 11:43 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mister Bailey. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/19 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38786937 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Mister Bailey(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]