Bojikyan v. Richardson et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Helmick |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02227 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Eastern, 1:24-cv-03606 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 7:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Jordan Carriers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Paul Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arman Bojikyan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Mon 04/21 11:43 AM
Notice [non-document]: To join the May 19, 2025 telephone conference, counsel shall call 419-718-0655, and use Meeting ID 849 763 788. Related document(s)25 ,26 . (M,SM) |
||
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Notice of Service of Defendants Initial Disclosures, Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Defendants First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by All Defendants. (Hudson, David) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Amended Case Management Conference Order with corrected deadline for Defendants' disclosure report(s). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/6/2025. (M,SM) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Order of Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2025. Time: 10 minutes. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 4/18/2025. Liability Discovery due by 3/20/2026. Further Telephone Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 10:30 AM with counsel to call the court's bridge line at 419-718-0655, Meeting ID 849 763 788. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/27/2025. (M,SM) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion to substitute attorney
Wed 02/19 12:25 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion to substitute attorney David R. Hudson for Lorne M. Reiter. Lorne M. Reiter removed from case. . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/19/2025.(M,SM) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Wed 02/19 12:29 PM
Notice [non-document]: Case management conference to be held on 2/27/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick with counsel to call the court's bridge line at 419-718-0655, Meeting ID 849 763 788. Related document(s)23 . (M,SM) |
||
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Motion to substitute attorney David R. Hudson in place of attorney Lorne M. Reiter filed by Michael Paul Richardson, Jordan Carriers, Inc..(Hudson, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Joint Status Report filed by All Parties.(Hudson, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Tue 01/07 9:55 AM
Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Gil Zohar. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/7/2025.(M,SM) |
||
order
Order
Tue 01/07 10:04 AM
Order [non-document]: Counsel shall file a joint status report on or before January 31, 2025. The report should address their progress up to this point and propose next steps in the litigation, including deadlines for completion of those steps. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/7/2025. (M,SM) |
||
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Motion for attorney GIL ZOHAR to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12895713, filed by Plaintiff Arman Bojikyan.(Miller, Robert) Modified text on 1/6/2025 (B,DL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
21 | 21
![]() Attorney Appearance by Robert P. Miller filed by on behalf of Arman Bojikyan. (Miller, Robert) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Lorne M. Reiter and adding attorney David R. Hudson filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Hudson, David) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
Mon 12/23 11:31 AM
Notice to Attorney Yuriy Prakhin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) |
||
oth_evt
Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
Mon 12/23 11:32 AM
Notice to Attorney Anna Collette Broxmeyer. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) |
||
oth_evt
Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
Mon 12/23 11:33 AM
Notice to Attorney Jason S. Matuskiewicz. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) |
||
oth_evt
Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
Mon 12/23 11:34 AM
Notice to Attorney Lorne M. Reiter. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) |
||
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,DM) |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
ORDER: The proposed17 Stipulation to Transfer Venue is so ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Western Division pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1. The provision of Local Civil Rule 83.1 requiring a seven-day stay is hereby waived. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mark this case closed upon transfer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/20/2024. (SGC) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Fri 12/20 10:57 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (S,DM) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/20 10:58 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 12/20 11:03 AM
Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Jordan Carriers, Inc. are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (S,DM) |
||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Fri 12/20 11:21 AM
Copy of Docket Sheet and19 Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Attorneys Yuriy Prakhin, Law Offices of Yuriy Prakhin, P.C., 1883 86th Street, Brooklyn, NY 11214; Anna Collette Broxmeyer, Anna Broxmeyer, Esq. 7259 Shore Road, Ste 1f, Brooklyn, NY 11209; Jason S. Matuskiewicz, Law Office of Yuriy Prakhin, P.C., 1883 86th Street, Brooklyn, NY 11214 and Lorne M. Reiter Ste. 302, 740 Rivert Road, Fair Haven, NJ 07704 on 12/20/2024. Related document(s)19 . (S,DM) |
||
order
Order Transfer Case (District)
Fri 12/20 9:27 AM
ORDER: The proposed17 Stipulation to Transfer Venue is so ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Western Division pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1. The provision of Local Civil Rule 83.1 requiring a seven-day stay is hereby waived. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mark this case closed upon transfer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/20/2024. (SGC) |
||
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER re:16 Status Report filed by Arman Bojikyan. The parties have advised the Court that plaintiff now consents to transfer of this action. By 12/19/2024 , the parties shall file a stipulation requesting transfer of this action to another district. The parties shall identify in the stipulation the specific district where this case should be transferred. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/9/2024. (JDP) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, December 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Minute Entry for Status Conference proceedings held on 11/25/2024 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Jason S. Matuskiewicz for plaintiff; Lorne M. Reiter for defendants. Parties have exchanged discovery relating to the personal jurisdiction issue. Plaintiff requested additional time to review defendants' discovery responses. By 12/9/2024 , parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report. In the status report, parties shall advise the Court whether plaintiff consents to pursue this action in Ohio or whether defendants anticipate renewing their request to move to dismiss based on lack of personal jurisdiction. (Cisco Recording.) (SGC) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Thursday, November 21, 2024 | ||
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to an unanticipated conflict in the Court's schedule the telephonic status conference previously scheduled for 11/22/2024 is adjourned to 11/25/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Each party is directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501# . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 11/21/2024. (SGC) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
SCHEDULING ORDER re:13 Status Report filed by Arman Bojikyan. The Court enters the following schedule for limited jurisdictional discovery: By October 14, 2024 , plaintiff shall serve written jurisdictional discovery upon defendants; by November 14, 2024 , defendants shall respond to written jurisdictional discovery. The Court declines to set a briefing schedule at this time. The Court adjourns the schedule for fact discovery in the interim. A telephonic status conference will be held on 11/22/2024 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Each party is directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501#. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/8/2024. (JDP) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Monday, October 07, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
Minute Entry for Pre-motion Conference proceedings held on 9/30/2024 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Anna Collette Broxmeyer for plaintiff; Lorne M. Reiter for defendants. Case discussed. By 10/7/2024 , parties shall file a joint status report that advises the Court whether they would like to participate in a settlement conference. After the parties have discussed privately, if the parties do not believe a settlement conference would be productive at this time, they shall propose a schedule, within the existing discovery schedule, for completing discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction, and propose a briefing schedule with respect to defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction in accordance with Individual Practice Rules of District Judge Diane Gujarati. (Cisco Recording.) (JDP) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
ORDER granting9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A telephonic pre motion conference will be held on 9/30/2024 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Each party is directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501# . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 9/20/2024. (SGC) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:9 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Jordan Carriers, Inc., Michael Paul Richardson respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 9/17/2024. (AD) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
Minute Entry for Initial Conference proceedings held on 7/10/2024 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Anna Collette Broxmeyer for plaintiff; Lorne M. Reiter for defendants. This is a personal injury action involving a collision between two trucks. The Court entered the following pretrial schedule: parties to exchange automatic disclosures by 7/31/2024; no amendment of the pleadings or joinder of additional parties permitted after 10/10/2024 without good cause; parties to complete fact discovery by 2/10/2025 ; affirmative expert disclosures due by 3/10/2025; rebuttal expert disclosures due by 4/10/2025; and all discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed by 5/10/2025 . The Court will set a deadline for commencing dispositive motion practice after the parties have completed discovery, if necessary. By 10/10/2024 , parties shall submit a joint status report and advise the Court whether they would like a referral to the Court-annexed mediation program or a settlement conference at that time. By 7/31/2024 , plaintiff shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Cisco Recording.) (JDP) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD) [Transferred from nyed on 12/20/2024.] | ||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |