Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00729
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 1:26 AM CST
Defendant
Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Sandra Zamora Zayas
Asst Fed Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Luis Salazar
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 2:53 AM CST
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 12/10/2024 as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by the U.S. Probation Office. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. Based on the review of defendant's Financial Affidavit, the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appointment of counsel. Defendant, through counsel, waived his right to a Preliminary Examination. Defendant acknowledges signature on the Waiver; Waiver accepted by the Court. Bond set $25,000 cash with the following conditions: Defendant shall first execute an immigration bond and secondly provide sufficient verifiable information demonstrating significant ties to the community. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, the Government is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. Appearances: AUSA: A Cano, AFPD: S Zayas f/defendant, USPO: D Ortiz, DUSM: S Sleep, ERO: D Reyna, Interpreter: J Ortiz ( mcg, 1) (09:33-09:52AM) [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute (1), filed. (Cameron) (dlr1) (sac1). [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute arrested on 12/9/2024, filed. (dlr1) (sac1). [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/10/2024) Unredacted attachment
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mcg1) [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mcg1) [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute, filed. [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute, filed. (sac1) [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute, filed. (als1) [1:24-mj-00702]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute (1) count(s) 1, filed. (jrl1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute, filed. (jrl1)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Jorge Luis Herrera-Matute. Arraignment set for 1/2/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt, filed. (jrl1)
Related: [-]