Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-01029
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 2:15 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tracia M. King
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
James Robert Mattingly, III (1)
Terminated: 11/22/2024
Represented By
Sean Jengwei Young
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/22/2024 3:03 AM EST
Friday, November 22, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5(c)(3)) of James Robert Mattingly, III. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Case Closed. Defendant James Robert Mattingly, III terminated. (dgr)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION for Detention by USA as to James Robert Mattingly, III. (dgr)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III: granting1 Governments Motion for Detention as to James Robert Mattingly III (1). Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to James Robert Mattingly, III held on 11/22/2024. Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing. Waiver filed. Detention Hearing as to James Robert Mattingly, III. Commitment issued; defendant ORDERED held for removal to charging district. (Tape #FTR) (dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by James Robert Mattingly, III (dgr)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Sean Young as to James Robert Mattingly, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/22/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by James Robert Mattingly, III. (dgr)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial as to James Robert Mattingly, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/22/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
7 7 Document Filed In Error, Wrong PDF Attached, refiled at 8 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to James Robert Mattingly, III. Defendant committed to District of USDC Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/22/2024. (dgr) Modified on 11/27/2024 (dgr).
Related: [-]
8 8 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to James Robert Mattingly, III. Defendant committed to District of USDC Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/22/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]