Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Mark G Mastroianni
Referred: David H Hennessy
Case #: 3:14-cv-30211
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2014
Terminated:May 31, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jun 08, 2015 8:35 AM EDT
Defendant
William H. Cosby, Jr.
Represented By
Robert P. LoBue
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth S. Zuckerman
Bulkley Richardson & Gelinas
contact info
Francis D. Dibble, Jr.
Bulkley Richardson & Gelinas
contact info
Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Bulkley, Richardson & Gelinas
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamara Green
Represented By
Matthew M. Tievsky
Cchaikin, Sherman, Cammarata & Siegel, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Cammarata
Chaikin, Sherman, Cammarata & Siegel, P.C.
contact info
Andrew M. Abraham
Abraham & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Therese Serignese
Represented By
Matthew M. Tievsky
Cchaikin, Sherman, Cammarata & Siegel, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Cammarata
Chaikin, Sherman, Cammarata & Siegel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Traitz
Represented By
Matthew M. Tievsky
Cchaikin, Sherman, Cammarata & Siegel, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Cammarata
Chaikin, Sherman, Cammarata & Siegel, P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 16 2015
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the reasons set forth, the Pltfs' are GRANTED the requested leave to file a second amended complaint - 18. Pltfs' should now docket their second amended complaint in accordance with CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Deft. may file a motion to dismiss which responds to the newly amended complaint, or which supplements the dismiss motions previously filed, by 4/30/2014. If applicable, Pltfs' may file their amended opposition in response to a new or supplemental motion to dismiss by 5/14/2015. (Finn, Mary)
GPO Oct 09 2015
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTIONSTO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT entered denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants motions to dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 21, 22, and 23) areDENIED in their entirety.(see attached Memorandum) (Pelegano, Theresa)
GPO Dec 31 2016
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 127 Motion to Quash; denying 127 Motion for Protective Order (DHH, law2)
GPO Jan 05 2016
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered granting 151 Emergency MOTION to Stay Deposition Currently Set for Jan. 6, 2016. (Belpedio, Lisa)
GPO Feb 11 2016
ot falling within an exception, but otherwise DENIED. (Finn, Mary) (Main Document 187 replaced on 2/11/2016 with correct Memornadum and Order) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 2/11/2016 (Finn, Mary).Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered RE: Camille Cosby's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Her Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena, or, in the alternative, for a protective order - 175. For the reasons set forth, Deponent's motion to set aside and modify the December 31, 2015 ruling (Dkt. 146) is ALLOWED in PART insofar as Deponent may refuse to answer deposition questions which call for testimony prohibited by the marital disqualifications rule and n
GPO Apr 04 2016
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: For the reasons stated. Defendants motion to stay this action during the pendency of his criminal suit (Dkt. No. 185) is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part insofar as discovery addressed to Defendant is stayed pending the resolution of his criminal case, but this action is not stayed in any other respect. The court also DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendants discovery responses (Dkt. No. 227), and DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiffs motion for protective order staying Defendants discovery addressed to Plaintiffs (Dkt. No. 224.) Defendant is hereby directed to file status reports every sixty days beginning on April 18, 2016, apprising the court of the latest developments in his criminal proceedings as a way to monitor the civil stay. It is So Ordered. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)

1. Bill Cosby's Wife, Camille, Deposed In Defamation Lawsuit (npr.org)
Submitted Tue 02/23/2016
2. Four More Women Added to Bill Cosby Defamation Lawsuit (jezebel.com)
Submitted Mon 11/16/2015
3. First hearing set in defamation lawsuit against Bill Cosby (foxnews.com)
Submitted Fri 05/08/2015
4. Bill Cosby asks judge to dismiss 3 accusers' defamation lawsuit (6abc.com)
Submitted Mon 03/02/2015
5. Lawyers for Bill Cosby to ask U.S. judge to dismiss lawsuit (reuters.com)
Submitted Wed 02/25/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 31, 2019
551 551 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/31 2:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by William H. Cosby, Jr. (Kelly-Kilgore, Sarah)
Related: [-]