Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00084
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Fernando Flores (1)
Represented By
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Neftali J Villafranca
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Hubert Booth
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/25/2024 2:39 AM CST
Monday, December 16, 2024
Arrest of Fernando Flores. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Fernando Flores. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Fernando Flores (1), filed. (Lavaca) (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Fernando Flores: Initial Appearance set for 12/20/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (kwp2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
***Set Hearings as to Fernando Flores: Initial Appearance by video set for 12/20/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. (kwp2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Neftali J Villafranca appearing for Fernando Flores , filed. (Villafranca, Neftali) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
Interpreter needed as to Fernando Flores. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Fernando Flores added. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Fernando Flores. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Fernando Flores added. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Fernando Flores. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Fernando Flores added. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Patricia Hubert Booth appearing for USA, filed. (Booth, Patricia) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Fernando Flores. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Fernando Flores added. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Fernando Flores. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Fernando Flores added. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Fernando Flores (Defendant informed of rights) held on 12/20/2024. Defendant states he will retain counsel. Government moves for detention and requests continuance. Court grants Governments request for continuance. Rights to consular notification given. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 12/26/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby Appearances:USMS: Taylor Davis and Luke Byars; USPB: Alyssa Barrera. Patricia Hubert Booth, Neftali J Villafranca.(Digital # 9:53-10:02)(ERO:Sarah Martin) (Interpreter:Juanita Zambrana) Deft remanded to custody, filed. (jrm2) [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Fernando Flores, filed. [6:24-mj-00046]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Fernando Flores: Arraignment & Detention Hearing set for 12/26/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (kwp2)
Related: [-]
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Fernando Flores: Preliminary Examination set for 12/26/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby is cancelled. Arraignment has been scheduled. (kwp2)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Fernando Flores: Arraignment & Detention Hearing set for 12/26/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (kwp2)
Related: [-]
4 4 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Fernando Flores (1) count(s) 1, filed. (bnb6)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
5 5 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Fernando Flores, filed. (bnb6)
Related: [-]
6 6 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Fernando Flores. Motions to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial, Motions in Limine, Exhibit and Witness Lists, and Proposed Jury Instructions due no later than three (3) days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Arraignment set for 12/30/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos.. Jury Trial set for 1/27/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (bnb6)
Related: [-]