Amoruso v. Admin Recovery, LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Nina Y Wang |
Referred: | Kathryn A Starnella |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03570 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 3:01 AM MST |
Defendant
Admin Recovery, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Laura Amoruso
1175 Newstar Way #234
Golden, CO 80403 |
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/27 4:09 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/27/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc7, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Letter from Clerk of Court re: Service of Process of4 Amended Complaint. (norlin, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 1/21/2025. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-03570-NYW . (sphil, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Admin Recovery, LLC, filed by Laura Amoruso.(sphil, ) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 12/27/2024. (amona, ) |
|
Thursday, December 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 12/26 2:41 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry. (agryan) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Admin Recovery, LLC (Filing Fee: 405.00, Receipt Number: 112829), filed by Laura Amoruso.(agryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |