Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Christopher B Brown
Case #: 2:25-cv-00005
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, GD-24-013082
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:20 AM EST
Defendant
FEDEX GROUND
Represented By
Claire M. Cookinham
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD L. BASINGER
Represented By
Andrew J. Leger, Jr.
Law Office Of Andrew J. Leger, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 04/10 9:58 AM
TEXT ORDER granting25 Motion to Continue: The parties shall mediate before John Noble by May 30, 2025. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court by June 3, 2025 indicating the outcome of mediation, and if the case is not resolved, the parties may include any jointly proposed amendments to the Case Management Order in their report. All other deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher B. Brown on 4/10/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajs)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Proposed Order part of main document Thu 04/10 9:09 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re25 Motion to Continue. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (tla)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Thu 04/10 9:19 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re25 Motion to Continue. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information, specifically the Bar ID, address, phone number and email address. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (tla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 motion Continue Wed 04/09 5:09 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Mediation Date by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
24 24 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/08 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER: After this case having been reassigned to the undersigned, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Order17 remains in effect, including the parties' deadline to mediate before John Noble on May 5, 2025. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court by May 9, 2025 indicating the outcome of mediation, and if the case is not resolved, the parties may include any jointly proposed amendments to the Case Management Order in their report. If necessary, the Court will schedule a status conference with the parties after mediation to discuss the case's progression. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher B. Brown on 4/8/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
23 23 order Order Mon 04/07 10:54 AM
TEXT ORDER granting22 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge filed by RICHARD L. BASINGER Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/7/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Consent (Joint) to Proceed before US Mag. Judge Mon 04/07 10:33 AM
Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/07 3:39 PM
Judge Arthur J. Schwab no longer assigned to case. (tla)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/07 3:52 PM
Magistrate Judge Christopher B. Brown added. (tla)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
21 21 misc Consent (Joint) to Proceed before US Mag. Judge Fri 04/04 5:09 PM
Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Consent (Joint) to Proceed before US Mag. Judge Fri 04/04 5:06 PM
Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 04/04 5:02 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Wed 03/05 11:31 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. John Noble is appointed as mediator. Mediation is scheduled for 5/5/25. Counsel is to notify the Court if the mediation does not occur as scheduled. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/5/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Case Management Order Wed 03/05 11:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 3/10/2025; Motion to Compel due by 3/17/2025; Response to Motion to Compel due by 3/27/2025; Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2025; Discovery due by 8/4/2025; Plaintiff Pretrial Statement due by 10/3/2025; Defendant Pretrial Statement due by 10/13/2025; Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 7/3/2025; Defendant Expert Reports due by 7/23/2025; Expert Depositions to be completed by 8/4/2025; Summary Judgment due by 8/25/2025; Response to Summary Judgment due by 9/4/2025; Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 4/4/2025. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/5/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 03/05 11:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arthur J. Schwab: Case Management Conference held on 3/5/2025. Case Management Order issued. Parties agreed to mediate before John Noble on 5/5/25. An Amended ADR Stipulation shall be filed once counsel confirms the time of the mediation. Discussed pre-mediation/ENE discovery. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Court Reporter: A. Martin) (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 misc Proposed Case Management Order Tue 03/04 11:57 AM
Proposed Case Management Order by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 03/04 11:45 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Tue 03/04 9:51 AM
TEXT ORDER Counsel is reminded that your documents for tomorrow's Initial Case Management Conference are PAST DUE: Stipulation selecting ADR process with a confirmed date with neutral that must occur within 60 days of the Initial Case Management Conference; and a fully completed Proposed Case Management Order which must follow the Court's timetable for progress of the case per Judge Schwab's Practices and Procedures. See, https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Schwab_Practices_Procedures_11_21.pdf. BOTH DOCUMENTS ARE ORDERED TO BE FILED ON ECF BY NOON TODAY. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or notice on the matter. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/4/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 order Order Thu 02/27 9:41 AM
TEXT ORDER STRIKING11 Stipulation selecting ADR process for failure to choose a specific date for the ADR session which is confirmed with the neutral, and which must occur within 60 days of the Initial Case Management Conference. Counsel is also reminded that a fully completed Proposed Case Management Order is due and must follow the Court's timetable for progress of the case per Judge Schwab's Practices and Procedures. See, https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Schwab_Practices_Procedures_11_21.pdf. A fully completed Amended Stipulation Selecting ADR process AND a fully completed Proposed Case Management Order are due on or before 3/3/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or notice on the matter. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/27/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Wed 02/26 3:07 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by FEDEX GROUND. (Cookinham, Claire)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 02/26 10:33 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cookinham, Claire)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 01/31 12:10 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion to Continue. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/25 WILL NOW BE HELD ON 3/5/2025 at 10:15 AM by Video Conference before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 3/26/2025 (See Order at doc. no7 ). Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/31/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Continue Fri 01/31 10:58 AM
Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by RICHARD L. BASINGER. (Leger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/13 11:44 AM
ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/18/2025 at 10:15 AM by Video Conference before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 2/11/2025. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/13/2025. (lar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 01/09 4:30 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FEDEX GROUND. (Cookinham, Claire)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/07 12:43 PM
ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/7/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice of ADR Designation Tue 01/07 12:41 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 01/06 1:17 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Federal Express Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by FEDEX GROUND. (Cookinham, Claire)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Mon 01/06 1:09 PM
Errata re1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by FEDEX GROUND. Reason for Correction: Adding the Civil Cover Sheet to the Notice of Removal. (Cookinham, Claire)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/06 10:06 AM
Judge Arthur J. Schwab added. (tla)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No Civil Cover Sheet Attached QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 10:14 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal ERROR: Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required for all civil cases, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a complete civil cover sheet by using the Errata event and linking it to the initiating document., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)).(Disclosure Statement due by 1/13/2025.) (tla)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 11:54 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 1/13/2025. (tla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required) Thu 01/02 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD-24-013082. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8629888), filed by FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.. (Cookinham, Claire)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D