Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:25-cv-20017
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Jeremy Berger
Represented By
David Andrew Aronberg
Dave Aronberg Law, P.A.
contact info
Ronald K. Anguas, Jr.
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Bradley Joseph Bondi
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Jessica N. Meyers
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Camille M. Vasquez
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Cameron A. Brown
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Thomas V. Panoff
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
DPayments, LLC
Represented By
David Andrew Aronberg
Dave Aronberg Law, P.A.
contact info
Bradley Joseph Bondi
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Jessica N. Meyers
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Camille M. Vasquez
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Cameron A. Brown
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Thomas V. Panoff
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deel, Inc.
Represented By
David Andrew Aronberg
Dave Aronberg Law, P.A.
contact info
Ronald K. Anguas, Jr.
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Bradley Joseph Bondi
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Jessica N. Meyers
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Camille M. Vasquez
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Cameron A. Brown
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Thomas V. Panoff
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Melanie E. Damian
Represented By
Thomas R. Grady
Thomas R. Grady, P.A. Dba Gradylaw
contact info
Guy Millard Burns
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Wed 04/09 4:04 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Melanie E. Damian (Burns, Guy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Rippling v. Deel Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Sworn Affid of Keith O'Brien
Thursday, February 27, 2025
24 24 88 pgs notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 02/27 9:41 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re14 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Complaint DEFENDANTS LOCAL RULE 7.8 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger (Bondi, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
23 23 17 pgs respm Reply in Support of Motion Thu 02/13 7:38 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Complaint . filed by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger. (Bondi, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/06 4:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Complaint filed by Melanie E. Damian. Replies due by 2/13/2025.(Burns, Guy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 B,
Att: 3 C
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Exhibit by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger re14 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Complaint (Aronberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Licenses/Registrations
Monday, February 03, 2025
20 20 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/03 1:30 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Camille M. Vasquez. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/3/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/03 1:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Thomas V. Panoff. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/3/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/03 1:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Jessica N. Meyers. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/3/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Fri 01/31 12:23 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Camille M. Vasquez. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18167020 by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger. Responses due by 2/14/2025. (Aronberg, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 01/30 11:57 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas V. Panoff. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18167019 by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger. Responses due by 2/13/2025. (Aronberg, David)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 01/30 11:37 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jessica N. Meyers. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18167007 by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger. Responses due by 2/13/2025. (Aronberg, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 26 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 01/23 11:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Complaint by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger. Responses due by 2/6/2025.(Bondi, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E,
Att: 6 22 pgs Exhibit Ex. F
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 1:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Cameron A. Brown. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/23/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Wed 01/22 3:55 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cameron A. Brown. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-18139518. Filing Fee $ 250.00 by Deel, Inc., DPayments, LLC, Jeremy Berger. Responses due by 2/5/2025.(Aronberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certificates of Good Standing
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/21 1:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Ronald K. Anguas Jr. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/21/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 01/21 12:01 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Melanie E. Damian. Jeremy Berger served on 1/17/2025, response/answer due 2/7/2025. (Burns, Guy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 01/16 10:24 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ronald K. Anguas Jr.. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18123220 by Deel, Inc.. Responses due by 1/30/2025. (Aronberg, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 01/16 8:52 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re7 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves ; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the proper filer(s)/case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the proper filer(s)/case. It is not necessary to refile this document. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the proper filer(s)/case. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/15 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Andrew Aronberg on behalf of Deel, Inc.. Attorney David Andrew Aronberg added to party Deel, Inc.(pty:dft). (Aronberg, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/10 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Joseph Bondi on behalf of JEREMY BERGER, DEEL INC., DPAYMENTS LLC. Attorney Bradley Joseph Bondi added to party JEREMY BERGER(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Joseph Bondi added to party DEEL INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Joseph Bondi added to party DPAYMENTS LLC(pty:dft). (Bondi, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 01/08 11:59 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Melanie E. Damian. DPAYMENTS LLC served on 1/7/2025, response/answer due 1/28/2025. (Burns, Guy)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 01/08 11:58 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Melanie E. Damian. DEEL INC. served on 1/7/2025, response/answer due 1/28/2025. (Burns, Guy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
3 3 6 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 01/03 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to JEREMY BERGER, DEEL INC., DPAYMENTS LLC. (amb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 01/03 3:47 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 12:53 PM
COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18089738, filed by Melanie E. Damian, as Receiver.(Burns, Guy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 6 pgs Summon(s) Deel Inc., DPayments LLC, Berger,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F