Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00089
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 12:14 AM MST
Defendant
Liseth Itai Martinez-Acuna (1)
Represented By
Joel Moshe Chorny
Law Office Of Joel Chorny PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2025 2:04 AM MST
Thursday, December 26, 2024
Arrest of Liseth Itai Martinez-Acuna on 12/26/2024. (ARS) [4:24-mj-12087-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Liseth Itai Martinez-Acuna. (ARS) [4:24-mj-12087-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Liseth Itai Martinez-Acuna held on 12/30/2024. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant(s) temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Josh Ackerman, duty for the Government, AFPD Greg Berger, duty for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Hortensia Studer assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 1/14/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. Preliminary Hearing set for 1/14/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. Related [+] Hearing held 2:00 pm to 2:25 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:24-mj-12087-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald.(BHA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:24-mj-12087-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ORDER: Added appointed attorney Joel Moshe Chorny, CJA for Liseth Itai Martinez-Acuna. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (VB) [4:24-mj-12087-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 INFORMATION - Felony as to Liseth Itai Martinez-Acuna (1) count(s) 1, 2. (BAC)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Liseth Itai Martinez-Acuna. (BAC)
Related: [-]