Stafford County, Virginia vs Eli Lilly and Company, et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00044 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2025 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 4:51 AM EST |
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Zinc Health Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Unitedhealth Group
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Optuminsight, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumRx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Novo Nordisk Inc.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Defendant
Medco Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts, Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Administrators, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Evernorth Health, Inc. (formerly Express Scripts Holding Company)
|
|
Defendant
Emisar Pharma Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Eli Lilly and Company
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Caremark PCS Health, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ascent Health Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Stafford County, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 02/11 10:37 AM
Case transferred from the Eastern District of Virginia has been opened in the District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:25-cv-01122. (wgar, ) |
||
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFIED COPY of MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) - In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL No. 3080, transferring specified actions to the District of New Jersey. Signed by James V. Ingold, Clerk of the Panel on 2/10/2025. (wgar, ) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 02/10 11:51 AM
Case transferred to the District of New Jersey. Original file, transfer order, and docket sheet sent on 2/10/2025. (wgar, ) |
||
Thursday, January 09, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Complaint for Damages ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9938202.), filed by Stafford County, Virginia.(Spivey, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 01/14 3:13 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (dvanm) |