Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Case #: 3:25-cv-00064
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 4:50 AM CST
Defendant
Copart Inc
Defendant
Valfair Construction Inc
Represented By
Robert W Hellner
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Plaintiff
Kalmeron Kimmons
Represented By
Jesse L Kelly, II
Jesse Kelly PC
contact info
Brian P Sanford
Brian P Sanford PC
contact info
Elizabeth Jane Sanford
The Sanford Firm
contact info
Colby Levi Qualls
Forester Haynie Pllc - Little Rock
contact info
Matthew R McCarley
Forester Haynie, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Odell Kimmons
Represented By
Jesse L Kelly, II
Jesse Kelly PC
contact info
Brian P Sanford
Brian P Sanford PC
contact info
Elizabeth Jane Sanford
The Sanford Firm
contact info
Colby Levi Qualls
Forester Haynie Pllc - Little Rock
contact info
Matthew R McCarley
Forester Haynie, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dillon King
Represented By
Jesse L Kelly, II
Jesse Kelly PC
contact info
Brian P Sanford
Brian P Sanford PC
contact info
Elizabeth Jane Sanford
The Sanford Firm
contact info
Colby Levi Qualls
Forester Haynie Pllc - Little Rock
contact info
Matthew R McCarley
Forester Haynie, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order For ADR Wed 04/23 4:20 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/2/2025. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/23/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/23 4:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for four-week docket beginning 5/4/2026 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 7/22/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2025. Motions due by 12/15/2025. Discovery due by 12/1/2025. Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2026. Pretrial Materials due by 4/6/2026. Status Report due by 7/22/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2026 11:00 AM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/23/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 04/22 3:38 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Copart Inc, Valfair Construction Inc. (Hellner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
12 12 order Status Report Order Fri 03/21 3:46 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Attorney conference shall take place no later than 4/07/2025. No later than 4/22/2025, by 5:00 p.m., the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report ("Report") which sets forth the discovery plan proposed by the parties and any objections a party has to initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/21/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 03/20 9:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Copart Inc, Valfair Construction Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hellner, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/20 8:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Copart Inc, Valfair Construction Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Robert W Hellner added to party Copart Inc(pty:dft) (Hellner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/21 11:32 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint is 3/20/2025. No further extensions will be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/21/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/20 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Jane Sanford on behalf of Kalmeron Kimmons, Odell Kimmons, Dillon King. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sanford, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/20 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian P Sanford on behalf of Kalmeron Kimmons, Odell Kimmons, Dillon King. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sanford, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/19 9:39 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Valfair Construction IncAttorney Robert W Hellner added to party Valfair Construction Inc(pty:dft) (Hellner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
5 5 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 12:47 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse L. Kelly. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/4/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/31 3:05 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jesse Kelly (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15231248) filed by Odell Kimmons, Kalmeron Kimmons, Dillon King (Qualls, Colby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Copart Inc, Valfair Construction Inc. (knb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
2 2 qcref Lindsay Fri 01/10 10:33 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/09 5:52 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kalmeron Kimmons, Odell Kimmons, Dillon King. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15177478) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Qualls, Colby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons