Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00026
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 1:24 AM CST
Defendant
Kendra Petatan (1)
Represented By
Francisco Morales
Francisco Morales
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Material Witness
Bryan Jesus Majano-Hernandez
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Victor Manuel-Ramos
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Kelvin Josue Martinez-Rodriguez
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Ana Laura Triminio-Flores
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Zachary Dell Bird
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/11/2025 2:04 AM CST
Sunday, December 15, 2024
Arrest of Kendra Petatan. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kendra Petatan (1), filed. (Kenedy) Initial Appearance set for 12/17/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (ntg2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Victor Manuel-Ramos, Kelvin Jose Martinez-Rodriguez, Ana Laura Triminio-Flores, Bryan Jesus Majano-Hernandez as to Kendra Petatan. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 12/17/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (ntg2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Victor Manuel-Ramos, Kelvin Josue Martinez-Rodriguez, Ana Laura Triminio-Flores, Bryan Jesus Majano-Hernandez. Ruben R Lerma appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) KELVIN JOSUE MARTINEZ-RODRIGUEZ as to Kendra Petatan (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 12/17/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. Appearances: John Robert Lamont, AUSA; Ruben Lerma f/Material Witness; USM: B. Mayo. (Digital # 9:33-9:43) (ERO: Jared Marks) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) ANA LAURA TRIMINIO-FLORES as to Kendra Petatan (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 12/17/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. Appearances: John Robert Lamont, AUSA; Ruben Lerma f/Material Witness; USM: B. Mayo. (Digital # 9:33-9:43) (ERO: Jared Marks) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) BRYAN JESUS MAJANO-HERNANDEZ as to Kendra Petatan (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 12/17/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., AUSA states the material witness has prior removal/immigration history and moves for detention., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. Material Witness Hearing set for 12/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: John Robert Lamont, AUSA; Ruben Lerma f/Material Witness; USM: B. Mayo. (Digital # 9:33-9:43) (ERO: Jared Marks) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) VICTOR MANUEL-RAMOS as to Kendra Petatan (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 12/17/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., AUSA states the material witness has prior removal/immigration history and moves for detention., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. Material Witness Hearing set for 12/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: John Robert Lamont, AUSA; Ruben Lerma f/Material Witness; USM: B. Mayo. (Digital # 9:33-9:43) (ERO: Jared Marks) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Kendra Petatan (Defendant informed of rights) held on 12/17/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government recommends bond based on Defendant's minimal criminal history. Court grants bond. Court sets bond as follows: 1. $30,000 Unsecured Bond. ; 1a. Interviewed by the USPO and personal information verified by the USPO prior to release. The defendants residence must be pre-approved by the U.S. Probation Office. 2. The defendant must not violate federal state, or local law while on bond. 3. Pretrial Supervision in the WDTX-San Antonio Division. Follow instructions given by USPO; must keep attorney and USPO informed of their current address and phone number. 4. Maintain or actively seek employment or enroll in a full-time educational program. 5. No travel to Mexico nor any foreign country without Courts written approval. 6. Refrain from obtaining passport. 7. Avoid all contact with co-defendant, potential co-defendants. 8. Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device, or other dangerous weapons. 9. Refrain from excessive use of alcohol. 10. Report Contact with Law Enforcement. 11. Defendant agrees to attend all scheduled material witness depositions. Defendant agrees and stipulates that failure to attend scheduled deposition constitutes a knowing forfeiture of the defendant's right to be present during the deposition and amounts to a knowing waiver and forfeiture of the defendant's right to challenge, on any ground, the admissibility of any and all of the deposition testimony at trial and/or sentencing hearing.. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 12/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby.. Appearances: John Robert Lamont, AUSA; John Gill for Defendant; USPO: Jesus Botello; USM: B. Mayo. (Digital # 9:51-9:56) (ERO: Jared Marks) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Francisco Morales, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Kendra Petatan, filed. (Morales, Francisco) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Kendra Petatan. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kendra Petatan. Kendra Petatan (1) $30,000 Unsecured Bond (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (jrm2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
9 9 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Kendra Petatan, filed. [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Zachary Dell Bird appearing for USA, filed. (Bird, Zachary) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Kendra Petatan, filed. (rm2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
8 8 Appearance Bond Entered as to Kendra Petatan in amount of $30,000, filed. (jrm2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment Bond
10 10 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant, Material Witness Kendra Petatan, Bryan Jesus Majano-Hernandez in the case of Kendra Petatan, filed. (Lerma, Ruben) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant, Material Witness Kendra Petatan, Victor Manuel-Ramos in the case of Kendra Petatan, filed. (Lerma, Ruben) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings RE: MATERIAL WITNESSES Victor Manuel-Ramos and Bryan Jesus Majano-Hernandez: Detention Hearing set for 12/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby IS CANCELLED. WAIVERS FILED. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kendra Petatan, filed. (Morales, Francisco) [2:24-mj-00604]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
13 13 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Kendra Petatan (1) count(s) 1-4, filed. (as2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
14 14 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Kendra Petatan, filed. (as2)
Related: [-]
15 15 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Kendra Petatan. Arraignment set for 1/15/2025 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (as2)
Related: [-]