New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Case #: 7:25-cv-00340
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:206 FLSA: Minimum Wage
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Mastercard, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Klein
Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP
contact info
Elizabeth M. Sacksteder
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Johan Erik Tatoy
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
S. Brown
Represented By
Cara Elizabeth Greene
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Adam T Klein
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Chauniqua Danielle Young
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Shira Zahava Gelfand
Outten & Golden LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
G.A. Gomes
Represented By
Cara Elizabeth Greene
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Adam T Klein
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Chauniqua Danielle Young
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Shira Zahava Gelfand
Outten & Golden LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Hayman
Represented By
Cara Elizabeth Greene
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Adam T Klein
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Chauniqua Danielle Young
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Shira Zahava Gelfand
Outten & Golden LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
L. Kasomo
Represented By
Cara Elizabeth Greene
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Adam T Klein
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Chauniqua Danielle Young
Outten & Golden, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Shira Zahava Gelfand
Outten & Golden LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/17 9:01 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Letter filed by S. Brown, L. Kasomo, G.A. Gomes, Deborah Hayman. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Final Approval Hearing scheduled for May 14, 2025 is ADJOURNED to July 30, 2025 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 11B at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/30/2025 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke.) (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 4/16/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Tue 04/15 2:03 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Cara E. Greene dated April 15, 2025 re: Joint Motion to Reschedule Final Approval Hearing. Document filed by S. Brown, G.A. Gomes, Deborah Hayman, L. Kasomo..(Greene, Cara)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 02/03 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffrey S. Klein on behalf of Mastercard, Inc.. New Address: Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP, 41 Madison Avenue, 23rd Floor, New York, NY, USA 10010, 212-633-4310..(Klein, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Thu 01/30 1:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT granting4 Motion for Settlement. it is HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED as follows: Plaintiffs Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, L. Kasomo, and S. Brown ("Plaintiffs"), on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, and Defendant Mastercard, Inc. (collectively, the "Settling Parties") have negotiated a settlement of this action (the "Action") to avoid the uncertainty, expense, and burden of further litigation, and to resolve any and all claims being released by the Settlement Stipulation. The Settlement Stipulation entered into by and among the Settling Parties has been negotiated at arm's length and is approved on a preliminary basis as fair, reasonable, and adequate. A hearing regarding final approval of the Settlement Stipulation ("Final Approval Hearing") will be held on May 14, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, before the Honorable Jessica G. L. Clarke. The Court authorizes the Parties to take all necessary and appropriate steps to implement the Settlement Stipulation. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 1/30/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 01/30 1:43 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chauniqua Danielle Young on behalf of Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, S. Brown, L. Kasomo..(Young, Chauniqua)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shira Zahava Gelfand on behalf of Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, S. Brown, L. Kasomo..(Gelfand, Shira)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam T Klein on behalf of Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, S. Brown, L. Kasomo..(Klein, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/15 5:49 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mastercard, Inc...(Sacksteder, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Klein on behalf of Mastercard, Inc...(Klein, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Johan Erik Tatoy on behalf of Mastercard, Inc...(Tatoy, Johan Erik)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth M. Sacksteder on behalf of Mastercard, Inc...(Sacksteder, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 01/15 9:52 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mastercard, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 01/15 9:48 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 01/15 9:49 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 01/15 9:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 01/15 9:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Cara Elizabeth Greene. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code None; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:206; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 01/14 9:59 AM
DECLARATION of Cara E. Greene in Support re:4 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement .. Document filed by Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, S. Brown, L. Kasomo..(Greene, Cara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice
5 5 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 01/14 9:55 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:4 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement . . Document filed by Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, S. Brown, L. Kasomo..(Greene, Cara)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Settlement Tue 01/14 9:54 AM
MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement . Document filed by Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, S. Brown, L. Kasomo..(Greene, Cara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/14 9:20 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mastercard, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Hayman, G.A. Gomes, S. Brown, L. Kasomo..(Greene, Cara)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/14 9:18 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greene, Cara)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/14 9:14 AM
COMPLAINT against Mastercard, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30453886)Document filed by L. Kasomo, Deborah Hayman, S. Brown, G.A. Gomes..(Greene, Cara)
Related: [-]