Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11747

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brian F Kenney
Case #: 1:25-ap-01002
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mary Ann Medeiros
3602 Larchmont Dr
Annandale, VA 22003
Represented By
Mary Ann Medeiros
contact info
Defendant
Rickey E. Johnson
2 Le Moyne Drive
Beaufort, SC 29907
Represented By
Rickey E. Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
H. Jason Gold, Trustee
Represented By
Robert M. Marino
Redmon Peyton & Braswell, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Fri 04/18 12:16 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 04/15 1:52 PM
Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] 6
10 10 court Hearing held Tue 04/15 9:37 AM
Hearing held;Consent Order Staying Proceeding To Be Submitte Related [+] Appearance: Robert M. Marino Order/Disposition due by 04/29/2025. (KimberlyChandler)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by H. Jason Gold
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 03/08 12:17 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Order Cancelling/Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Pre-Trial Conference
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 order Cancelling/Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Pre-Trial Conference Wed 03/05 8:24 AM
Order Setting Final Pre-Trial Conference; Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/3/2025 at 09:30 AM at Chief Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 S Washington St, 2nd Flr, Courtroom I, Alexandria, VA, (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/04 2:05 PM
Notice of Hearing regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof Related [+] filed by Robert M. Marino of Redmon Peyton & Braswell, LLP on behalf of H. Jason Gold. Hearing scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 09:30 AM at Chief Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 S Washington St, 2nd Flr, Courtroom I, Alexandria, VA. (Marino, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by H. Jason Gold
6 6 motion Summary Judgment Tue 03/04 2:03 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Robert M. Marino of Redmon Peyton & Braswell, LLP on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Marino, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Deed)
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Beaufort Tax Records)
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Marital Settlement Agreement)
Att: 4 Exhibit D (Divorce Decree)
Att: 5 Proposed Order
5 5 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Tue 03/04 9:56 AM
Initial Pre-Trial Conference Held;Final Pre-Trial Conference Se Related [+] Appearance: Robert M. Marino; Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/03/2025 at 09:30 AM at Chief Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 S Washington St, 2nd Flr, Courtroom I, Alexandria, VA, (KimberlyChandler)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by H. Jason Gold
Monday, February 24, 2025
4 4 answer None Mon 02/24 2:48 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Rickey E. Johnson. (Lazo, Tatiana)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/14 5:41 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Summons, Initial Scheduling Order and Complaint Related [+] filed by Robert M. Marino of Redmon Peyton & Braswell, LLP on behalf of H. Jason Gold. (Marino, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by H. Jason Gold,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference, Initial Scheduling Order
2 2 order|summon Initial Scheduling Order|Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 01/14 11:32 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Rickey E. Johnson Answer Due 2/13/2025; Mary Ann Medeiros Answer Due 2/13/2025, Initial Scheduling Order Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at Chief Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 S Washington St, 2nd Flr, Courtroom I, Alexandria, VA, (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by H. Jason Gold
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 01/13 3:05 PM
Adversary case 25-01002 Complaint against Mary Ann Medeiros, Rickey E. Johnson (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by H. Jason Gold. Nature of Suit: (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 1:24-bk-11747 (Marino, Robert)
Related: [-]