Utah District Court
Judge:Howard C Nielson, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-00037
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 3:12 AM MST
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By
Jon A. Stenquist
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Gabe Davis
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura Nielson
Represented By
Laura C. Nielson
G Eric Nielson & Associates
contact info
G. Eric Nielson
G Eric Nielson & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 order Order Mon 04/28 11:32 AM
Discovery Management ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 04/28/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 11:23 AM
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Scheduling Order: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2025. Discovery due by 11/6/2025. Motions due by 12/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 04/28/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 motion Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 2:17 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Davis, Gabe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Attorney Planning Meeting Report
Thursday, March 20, 2025
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 03/20 3:53 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Attorney Planning Meeting and File Report. The parties' deadline to comply with paragraph 3 of the Order to Propose Schedule 3 is extended to April 25, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/20/2025. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/20 3:14 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to conduct attorney planning meeting and file report filed by Plaintiff Laura Nielson. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Nielson, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/11 2:41 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Answer.. Plaintiff seeks leave to file a reply in order to file a motion for a more definite statement as to Defendant's answer 7 . Rule 12(e) allows a party to move for a more definite statement as to a pleading for which "a responsive pleading is allowed but which is so vague or ambiguous that the party cannot reasonably prepare a response." Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e). Such motions are only appropriate "when a pleading is unintelligible or confusing and where the movant cannot reasonably be required to frame an answer or other responsive pleading to the pleading in question." Bloomquist v. Utah , No. 2:22-cv-00659, 2023 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 17315, at *4 (D. Utah Jan. 31, 2023) (unpublished) (internal quotation marks omitted). Because no responsive pleading is allowed for an answer, Plaintiff first moves for leave to file a reply to the answerin order to move for a more definite statement. Having reviewed Defendant's answer 7 and Plaintiff's motion 16 , Plaintiff has not demonstrated the answer is unintelligible or confusing so as to warrant a motion for a more definite statement. To the extent Plaintiff seeks information regarding the basis for Defendant's denials and affirmative defenses, Plaintiff may pursue discovery on these issues. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/11/2025. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 03/07 4:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Laura Nielson in Support re16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Laura Nielson. (Nielson, Laura)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/07 4:00 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Laura Nielson. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Nielson, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 utility Reassignment to District Judge Thu 02/27 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-3 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Thu 02/27 3:58 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Laura Nielson. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Tue 02/18 4:23 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (mh)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabe Davis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A (Davis, Gabe)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Tue 02/18 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Plaintiff Laura Nielson. (mh)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Tue 02/18 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Plaintiff Laura Nielson. Form due by 3/11/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabe Davis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A (Davis, Gabe)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Fri 02/14 4:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co as Corporate Parent. (Davis, Gabe)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/14 4:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Attorney Gabe Davis added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A(pty:dft)(Davis, Gabe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/05 4:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Laura Nielson. Summons as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Nielson, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Court issued summons
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 01/16 4:04 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request Summons Thu 01/16 3:42 PM
Requested Summons as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Nielson, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Thu 01/16 3:05 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/16/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint (Atty) Wed 01/15 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5300648) filed by Laura Nielson. (Nielson, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 1 pgs misc Remark - New Case Wed 01/15 4:36 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Laura Nielson is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)
Related: [-]