California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00406
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 2:01 AM PST
Defendant
City of Norwalk
Defendant
County of Los Angeles
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Campos Soto
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Humberto M Guizar
Law Offices Of Humberto Guizar
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/21 10:37 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Order to Show Cause10 - The OSC is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/18 4:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Campos Soto, upon Defendant County of Los Angeles served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dean C. Logan, Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/18 4:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Campos Soto, upon Defendant City of Norwalk served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jesus M. Gomez - City Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 04/18 2:56 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than April 25, 2025 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 04/16 10:48 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants City of Norwalk, County of Los Angeles. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 notice Summons Request Tue 04/15 5:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Campos Soto. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 01/17 3:07 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The courtesy copy requirement is suspended until further notice. All proceedings are held in person. Requests for remote appearances must be filed a week prior to the proceeding. Requests are made in a pleading format, with a declaration stating the good cause why the attorney cannot appear in-person. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 01/16 2:29 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 01/16 2:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 01/16 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/15 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Campos Soto, (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 01/15 5:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Campos Soto. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/15 5:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38919860 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Campos Soto. (Attorney Christian M. Contreras added to party Jose Luis Campos Soto(pty:pla))(Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]