New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:25-cv-00583
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 5:38 AM EST
Defendant
RAMON ESPINAL
Represented By
STEVEN K. PARNESS
Methfessel & Werbel
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
Defendant
JOHN DOES INCORPORATED 1-5
Defendant
MIKE REILLY
Represented By
STEVEN K. PARNESS
Methfessel & Werbel
contact info
Defendant
RIVERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
STEVEN K. PARNESS
Methfessel & Werbel
contact info
Defendant
BOROUGH OF RIVERDALE
Represented By
STEVEN K. PARNESS
Methfessel & Werbel
contact info
Defendant
KYLE PARRILL
Represented By
STEVEN K. PARNESS
Methfessel & Werbel
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL T MORATTO, JR.
Represented By
SALIM F. SABBAGH
Sabbagh Thapar LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Terminated: 02/28/2025
Represented By
JACOB NICKLESS STOCKTON
New Jersey Office Of The Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN K. PARNESS on behalf of BOROUGH OF RIVERDALE, RAMON ESPINAL, KYLE PARRILL, MIKE REILLY, RIVERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT (PARNESS, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
7 7 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Sun 03/02 6:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2025 at 3:30 p.m. before the Undersigned. The parties will dial 1-855-244-8681 and access code 2302-026-0103 to join the call. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 5/7/2025. Please mark your calendar accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/2/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Fri 02/28 4:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant State of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 2/28/2025. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 02/27 1:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by STATE OF NEW JERSEY.(STOCKTON, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement Cover Letter
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB NICKLESS STOCKTON on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (STOCKTON, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BOROUGH OF RIVERDALE, RIVERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, KYLE PARRILL, MIKE REILLY, RAMON ESPINAL.(PARNESS, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 23, 2025
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 01/23 9:23 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Enter the party name, select from the list and enter Riverdale Police Sergeant, as unknown and unidentified municipal, county, or state officials, supervisors, agents and/or employees or entities, etc., under party text. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Guide to Searching and Entering Parties http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/PartyNameGuideforAttorneys.pdf (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 1:18 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAMON ESPINAL, KYLE PARRILL, MIKE REILLY, RIVERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, STATE OF NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 5:26 PM
COMPLAINT against MICHAEL T MORATTO, JR., RIVERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, kyle parrill, MIKE REILLY, RAMON ESPINAL, JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES INCORPORATED 1-5 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15947330) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL T MORATTO, JR..(SABBAGH, SALIM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/16 9:17 PM
Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
Related: [-]