Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Ronald L Hanna
Case #: 4:25-cv-04027
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
Cause29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:02 AM CDT
Defendant
Tyro Construction Inc
Plaintiff
International Union of Operating Engineers Local 649
Represented By
John T Long
Cavanagh & O'Hara LLP
contact info
Hayden Eddings
Cavanagh & O'Hara LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Thu 04/24 2:56 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 6 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 04/22 10:25 AM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re6 MOTION for Default Judgment by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 649. (Eddings, Hayden)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/22 10:24 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers Local 649. Responses due by 5/6/2025(Eddings, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
order Order on Motion for Entry of Default ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/01 4:48 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on April 1, 2025. The docket reflects that Defendant was served on February 10, 2025.3 Aff. Service. Defendant's answer or other response was due by March 3, 2025, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1)(A)(i), but no answer or other response has been filed. Because Defendant "has failed to plead or otherwise defend," id. 55(a), Plaintiff's5 Request for Entry of Default is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter Defendant Tyro Construction, Inc.'s default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Plaintiff is directed to file a motion for default judgment by April 22, 2025, demonstrating its legal entitlement to the relief it seeks, see In re Catt, 368 F.3d 789, 793 (7th Cir. 2004), and setting forth the relief sought with sufficient admissible evidence attached to support every element of the requested relief. (ARR)
Related: [-]
order Entry of Default ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/03 8:55 AM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tyro Construction Inc entered by The Clerk 04/01/2025. (DW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
5 5 motion Entry of Default Wed 03/05 8:21 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers Local 649. Responses due by 3/19/2025(Eddings, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 02/20 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Hayden Eddings on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local 649 (Eddings, Hayden)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Thu 02/20 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 649. Tyro Construction Inc served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (Long, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/28 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Tyro Construction, Inc. and returned to Attorney John T. Long to effectuate service. (FDS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Mon 01/27 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT to Confirm Arbitration Award against Tyro Construction, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4656718.), filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 649, AFL-CIO.(Long, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons