Original Case: 4:24-cv-00187

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-05007
Typecivil / usa as party
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 1:15 AM MST
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER, SSA
Represented By
Michael J. Cooper
Office of the United States Attorney
contact info
Aimee Durel
Social Security Administration
contact info
Fatima Shah
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
COLTON JAMES RILEY
Represented By
John L. Harlan
John L. Harlan & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/28/2025 1:15 AM MST
Friday, January 24, 2025
[11153353] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/24/2025 Docketing statement due and Transcript order form due 02/07/2025 for Colton James Riley. Notice of appearance due on 02/07/2025 for Commissioner, SSA and Colton James Riley 25-5007
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Preliminary Record
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil