Washington Western District Court
Judge:Thomas S Zilly
Case #: 2:25-cv-00197
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause18:1595 Civil Remedies: Sex trafficking of children or TVPRA
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 3:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Cathy Bussey
Represented By
Katherine S Wan
Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP
contact info
Michael Rosenberger
Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Paydan Bussey
Defendant
Phillip Bussey
Represented By
Katherine S Wan
Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP
contact info
Michael Rosenberger
Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-100
Defendant
Thayne Lyman
Defendant
The Church of the Latter-Day Saints
Represented By
Meeghan Dooley
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Bussey
Represented By
Heather Melissa Cover
Rogers & Cover PLLC
contact info
James Steven Rogers
Rogers & Cover PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 04/15 3:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paydan Bussey on 4/15/2025, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rogers, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 3:32 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brittany Emsais FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8931268 (Rogers, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 3:24 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ryan McIntosh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8931243 (Rogers, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 3:17 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kimberly DeGonia FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8931204 (Rogers, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 04/15 8:39 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report is due by 6/16/2025, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/2/2025, and Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/16/2025. (KK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 service Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 04/11 1:06 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Michael Rosenberger, on behalf of Defendants Philip and Cathy Bussey, on 4/11/2025. (Cover, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/10 2:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold no longer assigned to case, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. (KAM)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent Letter & Form Thu 04/10 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 4/17/2025. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Francis S Floyd on behalf of Defendant Paydan Bussey. (Floyd, Francis)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Danielle P Smith on behalf of Defendant Paydan Bussey. (Smith, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 03/19 10:52 AM
Attorney Meeghan Dooley for Thayne Lyman added; per6 Notice of Appearance. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr on behalf of Defendant Thayne Lyman. (Schneider, Harry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Rosenberger on behalf of Defendants Phillip Bussey, Cathy Bussey. (Rosenberger, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 03/07 4:18 PM
Attorney Katherine S Wan for Cathy Bussey, Katherine S Wan for Phillip Bussey added; per5 Notice of Appearance. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 03/03 3:17 PM
Attorney Meeghan Dooley for The Church of the Latter-Day Saints added; per4 Notice of Appearance. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr on behalf of Defendant The Church of the Latter-Day Saints. (Schneider, Harry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 02/04 10:52 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to Defendant(s) Cathy Bussey, Paydan Bussey, Phillip Bussey, Thayne Lyman, The Church of the Latter-Day Saints(MIH) Modified attachment 3-1 as struck as duplicate on 2/4/2025 (LH).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 02/04 9:46 AM
Attorney Heather Melissa Cover for Brandon Bussey added; per2 Amended Complaint. (CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 02/04 10:26 AM
Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
2 2 40 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/03 4:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Brandon Bussey.(Rogers, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons Church,
Att: 2 Summons Paydan Bussey,
Att: 3 Summons Thayne Lyman,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons Phillip Bussey,
Att: 5 Summons Cathy Bussey,
Att: 6 Summons DOEs
Thursday, January 30, 2025
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/30 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney James Steven Rogers added to party Brandon Bussey(pty:pla) filed by Brandon Bussey.(Rogers, James)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8820927
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Church,
Att: 3 Summons Paydan Bussey,
Att: 4 Summons Thayne Lyman,
Att: 5 Summons Phillip Bussey,
Att: 6 Summons Cathy Bussey,
Att: 7 Summons DOES 1-100