MyECheck, Inc. v. Seven Miles Securities et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly J Mueller |
Referred: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-02889 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 31:3731 Fraud |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 09, 2015 6:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seven Miles Securities
|
|
Defendant
Sweetsun Intertrade, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Titan International Securities, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
MyECheck, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
100 | 100
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Tue 01/08 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No.99 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice in its entirety, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED and this case is CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
99 | 99
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/04 5:10 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by MyECheck, Inc.. (Meyer, Ryan) |