New York Northern District Court
Judge:Lawrence E Kahn
Referred: Mitchell J Katz
Case #: 3:25-cv-00157
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Net PayAdvance, Inc.
Represented By
Elyse D. Echtman
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Daniel S. Blynn
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyana Rainey
Represented By
Ross H. Schmierer
Kazerouni Law Group, A.P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel S. Blynn on behalf of Net PayAdvance, Inc. (Blynn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/13 1:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Net PayAdvance, Inc..(Echtman, Elyse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 1:24 PM
TEXT ORDER granting the #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 3/6/2025. (kck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 motion Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/04 2:51 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel S. Blynn, Esq. filed by Net PayAdvance, Inc. Receipt number 27M6ADNK for $100 filing fee. {Filed via MFT on 3/4/25} [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (tll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/20 6:44 PM
ORDER approving the #7 Stipulation for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint. Defendant Net PayAdvance, Inc. answer due by 3/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 2/20/2025. (kck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 02/18 2:38 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint STIPULATION [AND ORDER] EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Net PayAdvance, Inc. submitted to Judge Honorable Lawrence E. Kahn. (Echtman, Elyse)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/18 2:34 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Net PayAdvance, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nuvative Inc. for Net PayAdvance, Inc... (Echtman, Elyse)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elyse D. Echtman on behalf of Net PayAdvance, Inc. (Echtman, Elyse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Tue 02/11 7:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyana Rainey. Net PayAdvance, Inc. served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/27/2025. (Schmierer, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 02/04 1:45 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Video Conference set for 5/7/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/30/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (oca)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/04 1:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Net PayAdvance, Inc.. (oca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 1:41 PM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Net PayAdvance, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7017568) filed by Tyana Rainey.(oca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet