Member Case
Lead case is: 2:25-bk-10880

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-10881
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC, Debtor
1 Tarragon Dr
Johnston, RI 02919-3072
Represented By
Matthew A Lesnick
Lesnick Prince Pappas & Alverson LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 04/24 11:19 AM
Notice of lodgment of order converting case to chapter 7 Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) Related [+]. (Maroko, Ron)
Related: [-] 4 Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF)
Monday, February 24, 2025
22 22 5 pgs misc Amended List of Creditors (Fee) Mon 02/24 1:01 PM
Amendment to List of Creditors. Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC. (Lesnick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc List of Equity Security Holders Mon 02/24 12:45 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC. (Lesnick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 02/24 1:07 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK:2:25-bk-10881-BR] ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58073171. Fee amount 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#22
Thursday, February 20, 2025
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/20 10:16 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Patrick Kane Filed by Creditor ARCPE 1, LLC. (Kane, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
19 19 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) Tue 02/18 11:47 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202), Global Notes to Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum), Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B), Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D), Schedule E (Official Form B6E) - Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims, Schedule F (Official Form B6F) - Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims, Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G), Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H), Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207), Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC Related [+]. (Lesnick, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 02/12 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 notice Notice Tue 02/11 12:56 PM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents; and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC Related [+]. (Patel, Lisa)
Related: [-] 16 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) on Lead Case 2:25-bk-10880 with Member Case 2:25-bk-10881 (Related Doc14 ) Signed on 2/10/2025. (SF)
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Mon 02/10 3:36 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) on Lead Case 2:25-bk-10880 with Member Case 2:25-bk-10881 Related [+] Signed on 2/10/2025. (SF)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 02/10 2:25 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Granting Motion to Approve Joint Administration of Cases Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC Related [+]. (Lesnick, Matthew)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Joint Administration - Notice of Ex Parte Motion and Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Zachary A. Vella; and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC
14 14 motion Joint Administration (motion) Mon 02/10 2:22 PM
Motion for Joint Administration - Notice of Ex Parte Motion and Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Zachary A. Vella; and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC (Lesnick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/08 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 02/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/07 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 02/07 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC
Thursday, February 06, 2025
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/06 10:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew Bouslog Filed by Creditor Greyhawk Hawthorne Lender, LLC. (Bouslog, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Thu 02/06 9:43 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/3/2025 at 09:15 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/2/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
8 8 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 02/05 5:18 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Proof of service required. Related [+] (SM)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Greyhawk Hawthorne Lender, LLC
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/05 3:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew Bouslog Filed by Creditor Greyhawk Hawthorne Lender, LLC. (Bouslog, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Wed 02/05 2:00 PM
Related: [-]
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 02/05 11:03 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC
4 4 6 pgs order Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/05 11:02 AM
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/5/2025. Status hearing to be held on 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell relates to1 (SF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for a Certified Copy Wed 02/05 10:32 AM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :jmack@lesnickprince.com: Filed by Debtor 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC Related [+]. (Lesnick, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2 2 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 02/05 6:57 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Richards, Ronald. (Richards, Ronald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 02/05 10:39 AM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:25-bk-10881-BR] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58001397. Fee amount 12.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 3
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 02/04 9:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 13100 Yukon Avenue, Hawthorne LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/18/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/18/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/18/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/18/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/18/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/18/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/18/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 02/18/2025. (Lesnick, Matthew)
Related: [-]