Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Case #: 3:25-cv-00127
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 11:27 AM EDT
Appellant
Sky Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
David D. Burns
Ferrelle Burns, PA
contact info
Appellee
Seawalk Investments, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Brian Paysinger
Lansing J. Roy, PA
contact info
In Re
Seawalk Investments, LLC


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 03/25 2:29 PM
ORDER granting (5) the Unopposed Motion to Stay in case 3:25-cv-00127-TJC; granting (4) the Unopposed Motion to Stay in case 3:25-cv-00128-TJC. The cases and their respective deadlines are stayed until further order of the Court. The parties will either dismiss the appeals or provide a status report no later than 6/2/2025. Signed by Senior Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/25/2025. (JCD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
5 5 motion Stay Tue 03/18 2:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Sky Enterprises, LLC. (Burns, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
4 4 appeal Transmission of Bankruptcy appeal record Mon 03/17 5:23 PM
BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, filed by Sky Enterprises, LLC.(Miguenes, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 Notice_of_Appeal,
Att: 2 3 Notice,
Att: 3 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11,
Att: 4 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000016_Emergency_Motion_to_Use_Cash_Collateral_on_an_Interim_Basis_and_to_Determine_Ade,
Att: 5 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000023_Statement_of_Financial_Affairs__Schedules_A-H_List_of_Equity_Security_Holders,
Att: 6 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000025_Limited_Objection_to_Debtors_Emergency_Motion_for_Authority_to_Use_Cash_Collate,
Att: 7 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000026_Limited_Objection_to_Emergency_Motion_to_Use_Cash_Collateral_Filed_by_David_J_Li,
Att: 8 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000027_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING,
Att: 9 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000031_Expedited_Motion_for_Determination_that_Case_is_Single_Asset_Real_Estate_Case_Fi,
Att: 10 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000034_Response_to_Expedited_Motion_of_NLA_Jacksonville_LLC_for_a_Determination_that_t,
Att: 11 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000035_Opposition_Response_to_Proposed_Order_Renewed_Objection_to_Use_of_Cash_Collater,
Att: 12 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000037_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Debtors_Motion_for_Authority_to_Use_Cas,
Att: 13 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000038_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Determination_that_this_is_a_Single_Asset_Real_Estate,
Att: 14 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000047_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING,
Att: 15 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000052_ParT_1_Disclosure_Statement_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Seawalk_Invest,
Att: 16 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000052_ParT_2_,
Att: 17 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000052_ParT_3_,
Att: 18 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000052_ParT_4_,
Att: 19 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000052_ParT_5_,
Att: 20 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000052_ParT_6_,
Att: 21 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000053_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization__Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf_of_Debtor,
Att: 22 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000055_Agreed_Order_Authorizing_Debtors_Interim_Use_of_Cash_Collateral_and_Providing_A,
Att: 23 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000058_Order_Conditionally_Approving_Disclosure_Statement_Scheduling_Confirmation_Hear,
Att: 24 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000065_Notice_of_Intent_to_Serve_Third_Party_Subpoena_Filed_by_David_J_Lienhart_on_beha,
Att: 25 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000066_Second_Agreed_Order_Authorizing_Debtors_Interim_Use_of_Cash_Collateral_and_Prov,
Att: 26 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000074_Objection_to_Disclosure_Statement_and_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_b,
Att: 27 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000075_Corrective_Motion_for_Entry_of_Order_Establishing_Procedures_for_Disbursement_of,
Att: 28 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000076_Joinder_in_Objection_to_Disclosure_Statement_and_Plan_Filed_by_David_J_Lienhart,
Att: 29 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000077_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Final_Approval_of_the_Debtors_Disclosure,
Att: 30 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000078_Joinder_to_Objection_to_Plan_and_Disclosure_Statement_Filed_by_David_J_Lienhart,
Att: 31 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000081_Supplemental_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan__Objection_to_Disclosure_Stateme,
Att: 32 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000083_Notice_of_Issuance_of_Non-Party_Subpoenas_Filed_by_David_J_Lienhart_on_behalf_of,
Att: 33 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000086_Motion_to_Extend_Exclusivity_Period_for_Filing_a_Chapter_11_Plan_and_Disclosure,
Att: 34 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000090_Objection_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Order_Extending_Exclusive_Period_for_Filing_Chap,
Att: 35 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000091_Expedited_Motion_to_Appoint_Trustee_andor_Examiner_Filed_by_Jason_A_Burgess_on,
Att: 36 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000098_Joinder_to_Objection_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Order_Extending_Exclusivity_Period_F,
Att: 37 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000102_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Motion_for_Entry_of_Order_Establishing_Procedures_for,
Att: 38 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000104_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Motion_for_Approval_of_Disclosure_Statement,
Att: 39 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000105_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Confirmation,
Att: 40 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000106_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Motion_to_Extend_Exclusivity_Period_for_Filing_a_Chapt,
Att: 41 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000107_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Expedited_Motion_to_Appoint_Trustee_andor_Examiner,
Att: 42 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000124_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING,
Att: 43 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000129_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Exclusivity_Period_for_Filing_a_Chapter_11_Plan,
Att: 44 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000135_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING,
Att: 45 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000142_Final_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Use_Cash_Collateral_and_Providing_Adequate_Protec,
Att: 46 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000147_Motion_Pursuant_to_Section_1129,
Att: 47 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000148_Motion_Pursuant_to_Section_1129,
Att: 48 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000149_Motion_Pursuant_to_Section_1129,
Att: 49 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000150_Motion_Pursuant_to_Section_1129,
Att: 50 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000151_Motion_Pursuant_to_Section_1129,
Att: 51 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000152_Interim_Order_on_Motion_to_Compel_Debtor_to_Produce_Documents_and_Respond_to_Dis,
Att: 52 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000157_Motion_to_Approve_Compromise_of_Controversy_or_Settlement_Agreement_Related_Cas,
Att: 53 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000160_Amended_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization_-_Amendment_to_Plan_Filed_by_Robert_D,
Att: 54 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000161_ParT_1_Expedited_Motion_to_Convert_Case_to_Chapter_7,
Att: 55 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000161_ParT_2_,
Att: 56 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000161_ParT_3_,
Att: 57 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000161_ParT_4_,
Att: 58 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000165_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_to_Convert_Case_to_Chapter_7_or_Dismiss,
Att: 59 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000167_Order_Granting_Motion_for,
Att: 60 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000175_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Approve_Compromise_or_Settlement_between_Debtor_and_Hap,
Att: 61 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000178_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on,
Att: 62 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000185_ParT_1_Notice_of_TransferAssignment_of_Claim,
Att: 63 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000185_ParT_2_,
Att: 64 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000188_Notice_of_Issuance_of_Subpoenas_Duces_Tecum_to_Non-Parties_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd,
Att: 65 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000190_Motion_to_Require_Mediation_with_Sky_Enterprises_LLC_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_o,
Att: 66 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000193_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_Confirmation_and_Related_Matters_Scheduled_for_9,
Att: 67 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000198_Notice_of_Consent_to_Debtors_Motion_to_Continue_Trial_and_Hearings_on_Confirmat,
Att: 68 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000203_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Reschedule_Hearing_on_Trial_and_Hearings_Scheduled_for,
Att: 69 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000208_Order_Granting_Motion_and_Requiring_Mediation_Between_Debtor_and_Sky_Enterprises,
Att: 70 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000210_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING,
Att: 71 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000212_Second_Amended_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization,
Att: 72 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000215_Notice_of_Issuance_of_Subpoenas_Duces_Tecum_to_Non-Parties_Shapiro_Insurance_Gro,
Att: 73 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000226_ParT_1_Supplemental_Disclosure_Statement_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf_of_Debtor_S,
Att: 74 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000226_ParT_2_,
Att: 75 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000226_ParT_3_,
Att: 76 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000227_Expedited_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_All_Matters_Scheduled_for_1000_AM_o,
Att: 77 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000228_Objection_to_Motion_to_Continue_Hearing_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf_of_De,
Att: 78 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000229_ParT_1_Reply_In_Support_of_Its_Expedited_Motion_to_Continue_Hearing_Scheduled_For_July,
Att: 79 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000229_ParT_2_,
Att: 80 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000229_ParT_3_,
Att: 81 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000229_ParT_4_,
Att: 82 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000230_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Reschedule_Hearing_-_All_Matters_set_for_July_16_2020,
Att: 83 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000233_ParT_1_Motion_to_Compel_Debtors_Response_to_Request_for_Production_Filed_by_Ashley_Dod,
Att: 84 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000233_ParT_2_,
Att: 85 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000236_ParT_1_Motion_to_Compel_Compliance_with_Subpoena_as_to_Non-Party_Seabreeze_Motel_of_Jac,
Att: 86 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000236_ParT_2_,
Att: 87 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000238_ParT_1_Objection_to_Disclosure_Statement_with_Respect_to_Debtors_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Re,
Att: 88 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000238_ParT_2_,
Att: 89 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000238_ParT_3_,
Att: 90 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000239_Expedited_Motion_to_Convert_Case_to_Chapter_7__or_in_the_Alternative_Motion_to,
Att: 91 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000240_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Compel_Seabreeze_Motel_of_Jacksonville_Beach_Inc_to_C,
Att: 92 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000243_Disclosure_Statement_with_Respect_to_Sky_Enterprises_LLCs_Chapter_11_Plan_of_R,
Att: 93 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000244_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization_of_Sky_Enterprises_LLC_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_o,
Att: 94 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000260_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Compel_Debtors_Response_to_Request_for_Production,
Att: 95 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000262_ParT_1_Supplemental_Response_to_Debtors_Amended_Motion_Pursuant_to_11_USC_Section_1,
Att: 96 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000262_ParT_2_,
Att: 97 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_1_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Sky_Enterprises_LLC,
Att: 98 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_2_,
Att: 99 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_3_,
Att: 100 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_4_,
Att: 101 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_5A_,
Att: 102 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_6A_,
Att: 103 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_7A_,
Att: 104 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_8A_,
Att: 105 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_9A_,
Att: 106 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_10A_,
Att: 107 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_11A_,
Att: 108 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_12A_,
Att: 109 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_13A_,
Att: 110 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_14A_,
Att: 111 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_15A_,
Att: 112 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_16A_,
Att: 113 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_17A_,
Att: 114 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_18A_,
Att: 115 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_19A_,
Att: 116 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_20A_,
Att: 117 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_21A_,
Att: 118 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_22A_,
Att: 119 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_23A_,
Att: 120 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_24A_,
Att: 121 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_25A_,
Att: 122 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_26A_,
Att: 123 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_27A_,
Att: 124 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_28A_,
Att: 125 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_29A_,
Att: 126 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_30A_,
Att: 127 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_31A_,
Att: 128 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_32A_,
Att: 129 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_33A_,
Att: 130 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_34A_,
Att: 131 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_35A_,
Att: 132 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_36A_,
Att: 133 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_37A_,
Att: 134 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_38A_,
Att: 135 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_39A_,
Att: 136 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000267_ParT_40A_,
Att: 137 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_1_Exhibit_List_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Sky_Enterprises_LLC,
Att: 138 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_2_,
Att: 139 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_3_,
Att: 140 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_4_,
Att: 141 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_5_,
Att: 142 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_6_,
Att: 143 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_7_,
Att: 144 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_8_,
Att: 145 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_9_,
Att: 146 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_10_,
Att: 147 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_11_,
Att: 148 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_12_,
Att: 149 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_13_,
Att: 150 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_14_,
Att: 151 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_15_,
Att: 152 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_16_,
Att: 153 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_17_,
Att: 154 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_18_,
Att: 155 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_19_,
Att: 156 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_20_,
Att: 157 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_21_,
Att: 158 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_22_,
Att: 159 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_23_,
Att: 160 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000268_ParT_24_,
Att: 161 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000273_Supplemental_Disclosure_Statement_-_Second_Supplement_to_Disclosure_Statement_Fi,
Att: 162 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000282_Third_Amended_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization__Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_be,
Att: 163 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000290_Expedited_Motion_for_Entry_of_an_Order,
Att: 164 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000294_Order_Conditionally_Approving_Disclosure_Statement_and_Scheduling_Final_Hearing,
Att: 165 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000296_Notice_of_Filing_Expert_Report_of_Jason_Ryals_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of,
Att: 166 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000301_Brief_in_Advance_of_the_August_26_2020_Hearing_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_o,
Att: 167 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000302_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Debtors_Third_Amendment_to_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reor,
Att: 168 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000304_Emergency_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf,
Att: 169 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000306_Amended_Exhibit_List_for_the_Hearings_on_August_26_2020_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on,
Att: 170 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_1_to_54_72_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf,
Att: 171 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_2_,
Att: 172 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_3_,
Att: 173 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_4_,
Att: 174 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_16_,
Att: 175 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_17_,
Att: 176 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_18_,
Att: 177 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_19_,
Att: 178 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_20_,
Att: 179 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_21_,
Att: 180 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_22_,
Att: 181 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_23_,
Att: 182 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_24_,
Att: 183 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_25_,
Att: 184 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_26_,
Att: 185 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_27_,
Att: 186 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_28_,
Att: 187 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_29_,
Att: 188 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_30_,
Att: 189 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_31_,
Att: 190 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_32_,
Att: 191 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_33_,
Att: 192 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_34_,
Att: 193 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_35_,
Att: 194 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_36_,
Att: 195 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_37_,
Att: 196 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_38_,
Att: 197 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_39_,
Att: 198 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_40_,
Att: 199 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_41_,
Att: 200 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_42_,
Att: 201 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_43_,
Att: 202 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_44_,
Att: 203 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_45_,
Att: 204 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_46_,
Att: 205 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_47_,
Att: 206 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_48_,
Att: 207 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_49_,
Att: 208 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_50_,
Att: 209 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_51_,
Att: 210 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_52_,
Att: 211 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_53_,
Att: 212 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_54_,
Att: 213 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_55_,
Att: 214 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_56_,
Att: 215 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_57_,
Att: 216 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_58_,
Att: 217 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_59_,
Att: 218 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_5A_,
Att: 219 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_60_,
Att: 220 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_61_,
Att: 221 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_62_,
Att: 222 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_63_,
Att: 223 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_64_,
Att: 224 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_65_,
Att: 225 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_66_,
Att: 226 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_67_,
Att: 227 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_68_,
Att: 228 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_69_,
Att: 229 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_6A_,
Att: 230 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_70_,
Att: 231 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_71_,
Att: 232 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_72_,
Att: 233 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_7A_,
Att: 234 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_8A_,
Att: 235 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_9A_,
Att: 236 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_10A_,
Att: 237 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_11A_,
Att: 238 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_12A_,
Att: 239 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_13A_,
Att: 240 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_14A_,
Att: 241 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000307_ParT_15A_,
Att: 242 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000312_Supplemental_Disclosure_Statement_-_Third_Supplemental_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox,
Att: 243 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000321_Deposition_of_-_Designation_of_Deposition_Excerpts_of_Sky_Enterprises_LLC_Filed,
Att: 244 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000336_Order_Approving_Debtors_Disclosure_Statement_Service_Instructions_Robert_Wilc,
Att: 245 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000337_Order,
Att: 246 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000349_Notice_of_Issuance_of_Subpoenas_for_Deposition_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of,
Att: 247 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000350_ParT_1_Motion_to_Determine_the_Amount_of_Secured_Claim_Pursuant_to_Rule_3012_Filed_by_A,
Att: 248 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000350_ParT_2_,
Att: 249 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000351_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Sky_Enterprises_LLCs_Rule_3012_Motion_to_Dete,
Att: 250 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000354_Amended_Exhibit_List_for_Hearing_on_October_15_2020_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_beh,
Att: 251 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000355_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_17_to_55_4_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf,
Att: 252 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000355_ParT_2_,
Att: 253 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000355_ParT_3_,
Att: 254 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000355_ParT_4_,
Att: 255 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000361_Annotated_Exhibit_List_of_Creditor_Sky_Enterprises_LLC_from_Hearing_Held_on_Oct,
Att: 256 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000362_Order_Approving_Disclosure_Statement_and_Setting_Hearing_on_Confirmation,
Att: 257 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000369_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING,
Att: 258 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000370_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Motion_to_Determine_the_Amount_of_Secured_Claim_Pursua,
Att: 259 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000404_Motion_for_Third_Party_Injunction_or_In_the_Alternative_for_an_Order_Staying_S,
Att: 260 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000406_Motion_to_Carry_Over_Evidence_from_Prior_Hearings_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_be,
Att: 261 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000407_Amended_Exhibit_List_for_Confirmation_Trial_of_Skys_Plan_Scheduled_for_January,
Att: 262 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_to_18_19_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of,
Att: 263 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_2_,
Att: 264 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_3_,
Att: 265 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_4_,
Att: 266 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_5_,
Att: 267 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_6_,
Att: 268 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_7_,
Att: 269 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_8_,
Att: 270 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_9_,
Att: 271 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_10_,
Att: 272 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_11_,
Att: 273 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_12_,
Att: 274 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_13_,
Att: 275 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_14_,
Att: 276 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_15_,
Att: 277 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_16_,
Att: 278 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_17_,
Att: 279 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_18_,
Att: 280 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000414_ParT_19_,
Att: 281 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000415_Response_to_Debtors_Motion_to_Carry_Over_Evidence_from_Prior_Confirmation_Heari,
Att: 282 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000416_Response_to_James_Stockton_IIIs_Motion_for_Third_Party_Injunction_or_Stay_of_S,
Att: 283 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_19_to_25_10_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_o,
Att: 284 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_2_,
Att: 285 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_3_,
Att: 286 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_4_,
Att: 287 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_5_,
Att: 288 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_6_,
Att: 289 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_7_,
Att: 290 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_8_,
Att: 291 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_9_,
Att: 292 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000419_ParT_10_,
Att: 293 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000420_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_WITNESSES_EVIDENCE_RULING,
Att: 294 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000424_Annotated_Exhibit_List_of_Sky_Enterprises_LLC_from_Hearing_Held_on_January_28,
Att: 295 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000425_Annotated_Exhibit_List_of_Debtor_from_Hearing_Held_on_January_28_2021,
Att: 296 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000428_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Third_Party_Injunction_or_In_the_Alternative_for_an,
Att: 297 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000435_Certified_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_August_26_2020_on_Hearing_on_Motion,
Att: 298 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000436_Certified_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_August_27_2020_on_Hearing_on_Motion,
Att: 299 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000437_Certified_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_October_15_2020_on_Hearing_on_Motio,
Att: 300 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000449_Certified_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_February_18_2021_on_Confirmation_He,
Att: 301 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_to_22_23_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of,
Att: 302 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_2_,
Att: 303 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_3_,
Att: 304 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_4_,
Att: 305 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_5_,
Att: 306 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_6_,
Att: 307 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_7_,
Att: 308 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_8_,
Att: 309 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_9_,
Att: 310 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_10_,
Att: 311 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_11_,
Att: 312 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_12_,
Att: 313 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_13_,
Att: 314 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_14_,
Att: 315 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_15_,
Att: 316 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_16_,
Att: 317 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_17_,
Att: 318 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_18_,
Att: 319 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_19_,
Att: 320 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_20_,
Att: 321 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_21_,
Att: 322 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_22_,
Att: 323 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000453_ParT_23_,
Att: 324 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000454_Annotated_Exhibit_List_of_Debtor_from_Hearing_Held_on_February_18_2021,
Att: 325 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000472_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Housekeeping_Plan_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf_of_Debto,
Att: 326 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000472_ParT_2_,
Att: 327 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000474_ParT_1_Brief_in_Support_of_Confirmation_of_Sky_Enterprises_LLCs_Proposed_Chapter_11_Pl,
Att: 328 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000474_ParT_2_,
Att: 329 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000474_ParT_3_,
Att: 330 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000474_ParT_4_,
Att: 331 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000475_ParT_1_Brief_in_Support_of_Confirmation_of_Debtors_Plan_of_Reorganization_Filed_by_Rob,
Att: 332 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000475_ParT_2_,
Att: 333 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000476_Brief_on_Valuation_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Seawalk_Investme,
Att: 334 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000477_Brief_Regarding_Valuation_of_Debtors_Real_Property_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_beha,
Att: 335 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000478_Opposition_Brief_Filed_by_Robert_D_Wilcox_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Seawalk_Investment,
Att: 336 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000479_Opposition_Brief_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Sky_Enterprises_LLC,
Att: 337 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000481_Joint_Brief_-Reply_Brief_regarding_confirmation_of_Debtors_Plan_Filed_by_Robert,
Att: 338 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000483_Brief_-_Reply_Brief_in_Support_of_Confirmation_of_Skys_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorg,
Att: 339 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000486_First_Supplement_to_its_Motion_to_Dismiss_or_Alternatively_Motion_to_Compel_De,
Att: 340 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000487_ParT_1_First_Supplement_to_Sky_Enterprises_LLCs_Rule_3012_Motion_to_Determine_the_Amou,
Att: 341 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000487_ParT_2_,
Att: 342 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000487_ParT_3_,
Att: 343 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000487_ParT_4_,
Att: 344 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000487_ParT_5_,
Att: 345 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000488_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Compel_Debtor_to_File_Monthly_Operating_Reports,
Att: 346 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000507_Exhibit_List_and_Witness_List_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Sky_Ent,
Att: 347 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000511_Amended_Exhibit_List_and_Witness_List_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of_Creditor,
Att: 348 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_to_11_12_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of,
Att: 349 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_2_,
Att: 350 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_3_,
Att: 351 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_4_,
Att: 352 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_5_,
Att: 353 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_6_,
Att: 354 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_7_,
Att: 355 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_8_,
Att: 356 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_9_,
Att: 357 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_10_,
Att: 358 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_11_,
Att: 359 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000512_ParT_12_,
Att: 360 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000517_ParT_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_6Amended_to_6Amended_2_documents_attached_filed,
Att: 361 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000517_ParT_2_,
Att: 362 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000519_Motion_to_Compel_Debtors_Compliance_with_Court_Order_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_be,
Att: 363 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000531_Findings_of_Fact_and_Conclusions_of_Law,
Att: 364 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000532_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Determine_Secured_Status_Valuing_Debtors_Real_Propert,
Att: 365 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000533_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Determine_the_Amount_of_Secured_Claim,
Att: 366 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000534_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Convert_Case_to_Chapter_7_or_Dismiss,
Att: 367 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000538_Order_Confirming_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization,
Att: 368 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000540_ParT_1_Notice_of_Appeal,
Att: 369 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000540_ParT_2_,
Att: 370 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000540_ParT_3_,
Att: 371 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000540_ParT_4_,
Att: 372 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000541_ParT_1_Notice_of_Appeal,
Att: 373 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000541_ParT_2_,
Att: 374 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000541_ParT_3_,
Att: 375 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000542_ParT_1_Notice_of_Appeal,
Att: 376 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000542_ParT_2_,
Att: 377 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000542_ParT_3_,
Att: 378 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000543_ParT_1_Notice_of_Appeal,
Att: 379 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000543_ParT_2_,
Att: 380 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000543_ParT_3_,
Att: 381 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000543_ParT_4_,
Att: 382 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000560_Certified_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_09212021_on_Rule_3012_Motion_To_p,
Att: 383 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000574_Statement_of_Issues_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Sky_En,
Att: 384 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000679_Order_entered_on_August_29_2023_by_District_Court_Judge_Judge_Timothy_J_Corrig,
Att: 385 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000692_Order_Directing_Meet_and_Confer_Conference_and_Briefing_on_Attorneys_Fees_Allow,
Att: 386 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000695_Order_Amending_Order_Dated_May_6_2024_Directing_Meet_and_Confer_Conference_and,
Att: 387 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000701_ParT_1_Initial_Brief_in_Support_of_Including_Attorneys_Fees_in_Its_Secured_Claim_Filed,
Att: 388 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000701_ParT_2_,
Att: 389 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000701_ParT_3_,
Att: 390 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000703_Brief_In_Opposition_to_Sky_Enterprises_LLCs_Request_For_Attorneys_Fees_Filed_b,
Att: 391 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000706_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Corrected_Summary_of_Attorneys_Fees_Invoices_Filed_by_Ashley_D,
Att: 392 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000706_ParT_2_,
Att: 393 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000710_Reply_in_Support_of_Motion_for_Fees_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of_Creditor_S,
Att: 394 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000711_Joint_Stipulation_of_Debtor_and_Sky_Enterprises_re_Key_and_Disputed_Facts_Filed,
Att: 395 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000712_Findings_of_Fact_and_Conclusions_of_Law,
Att: 396 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000713_Order_Vacating_Findings_of_Fact_and_Conclusion_of_Law,
Att: 397 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000715_Order_Amending_Order_Dated_October_28_2021_Valuing_Sky_Enterprises_LLCs_Secur,
Att: 398 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000716_Proof_of_Service_of_Findings_of_Fact_and_Conclusions_of_Law_and_Order_Amending_O,
Att: 399 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000717_Consent_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Comply_with_the_Courts_Order_on_Skys_Secured,
Att: 400 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000719_ParT_1_Notice_of_Appeal,
Att: 401 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000719_ParT_2_,
Att: 402 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000719_ParT_3_,
Att: 403 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000720_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Comply_with_Courts_Order_on_Skys_Secur,
Att: 404 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000721_Notice_to_Appellant_of_Responsibilitiesfor_Notices_of_Appeal_filed_January_30_2,
Att: 405 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000722_Transmittal_of_Notice_of_Appeal_to_District_Court_Case_No_3-25-cv-127-TJC,
Att: 406 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000723_Transmittal_of_Notice_of_Appeal_to_District_Court_Case_No_3-25-cv-128-TJC,
Att: 407 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000724_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document,
Att: 408 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000725_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_to_Creditors_and_Parties_in_Interest,
Att: 409 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000726_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document,
Att: 410 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000727_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document,
Att: 411 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000728_ParT_1_Notice_of_Filing_Claim_Calculation_Information_Filed_by_Ashley_Dodd_on_behalf_of,
Att: 412 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000728_ParT_2_,
Att: 413 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000728_ParT_3_,
Att: 414 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000729_Statement_of_Issues_on_Appealby_Creditor_Sky_Enterprises_LLC_Filed_by_Ashley_Do,
Att: 415 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000730_Initial_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_File,
Att: 416 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000731_Notice_of_Acceptance_of_Sky_Enterprises_LLCs_Claim_Calculation_and_Payment_His,
Att: 417 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000732_Unopposed_Motion_to_Reschedule_Hearing_On_Unopposed_Motion_for_Brief_set_March_4,
Att: 418 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000733_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Reschedule_Hearing_on_Unopposed_Motion_for_Brief,
Att: 419 3-19-bk-01010_Docket_000734_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document,
Att: 420 4 Notice,
Att: 421 5 Findings_of_Fact_and_Conclusions_of_Law,
Att: 422 6 Docket
Saturday, February 08, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Sat 02/08 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David D. Burns on behalf of Sky Enterprises, LLC. Lead Counsel: David D. Burns. (Burns, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
2 2 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 02/07 10:51 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL All counsel of record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal Wed 02/05 2:58 PM
BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Sky Enterprises, LLC. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:19-bk-1010-JAF. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 1/30/2025. (eportal)(MDC) Modified on 2/5/2025 to edit docket text (MDC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law,
Att: 2 Appeal Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court