Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:25-cv-00130
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 4:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Arturo Guadalupe
Represented By
Mark A Perkins
Perkins & Assoc
contact info
Defendant
E D C Transportation L L C
Represented By
Mark A Perkins
Perkins & Assoc
contact info
Defendant
M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By
Mark A Perkins
Perkins & Assoc
contact info
Plaintiff
Bonna Saus
Represented By
Edward Dion Young
Gordon Mckernan Injury Attorneys (mon)
contact info
Plaintiff
John Arthur Saus
Represented By
Edward Dion Young
Gordon Mckernan Injury Attorneys (mon)
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 03/21 2:55 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by All Parties . (aty,Young, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included) Tue 03/04 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James Tue 03/04 9:01 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/25/2025. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/4/2025. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by E D C Transportation L L C, M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Perkins, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 order Removal Order Fri 02/07 4:27 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/7/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Thu 02/06 10:56 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/6/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Thu 02/06 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Edward Dion Young on behalf of John Arthur Saus, Bonna Saus. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/20/2025. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/05 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 3rd JDC Lincoln Parish, Case Number 64175 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6183918) filed by EDC Transportation, LLC., Arturo Guadalupe, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney Mark A Perkins added to party EDC Transportation, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A Perkins added to party MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A Perkins added to party Arturo Guadalupe(pty:dft))(aty,Perkins, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Record,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - MS Transverse Insurance Co. NAIC Info.,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - EDC Transportation, LLC. USDOT Info.,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Guadalupe CDL,
Att: 6 Exhibit Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure,
Att: 7 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement
service State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases) Thu 02/06 10:44 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co answer due 2/12/2025. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/06 10:48 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Corrective Action Thu 02/06 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to E D C Transportation L L C, Arturo Guadalupe, M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co regarding1 Notice of Removal. Action taken: Modified to remove jury demand from docket entry and court's docket since jury demand was not reflected in pleading filed. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 7:26 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E D C Transportation L L C, Arturo Guadalupe, M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #6 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 7:30 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E D C Transportation L L C, M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents M S & A D Insurance Group Holdings Inc, M S I G U S A for M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #7 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]