Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: Abizer Zanzi
Case #: 2:25-cv-00059
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Case in other court:Lake Superior Court, Civil Division 4, 45D04-2412-CT-001405
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 6:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Hook-SupeRx, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas G Brunette
Reminger Co Lpa - Ind/in
contact info
Brooke M Behrens
Reminger Co Lpa - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeannette Graham
Represented By
Brian N Custy
Custy Law Firm Llc - Val/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated Wed 04/02 11:10 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 4/22/2025. (shk)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Wed 04/02 10:14 AM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/1/2025, before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Pla appeared by atty Brian Custy. Dft appeared by atty Brooke Behrens. The Court ADOPTS the parties Report of Rule 26(f) and sets the following deadlines: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/1/2025. The deadline for Plaintiff to seek permission to join additional parties or amend the pleadings is 5/1/2025; and for Defendant is 6/2/2025. Deadline for Completion of Discovery is 4/1/2026. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 12/5/2025. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 1/5/2026. The parties deadline to serve any supplements pursuant to Rule 26(e)(2)is 5/1/2026. Parties select Michael Scopelitis appointed as mediator. The deadline to complete mediation or a judicial settlement conference 4/1/2026. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. (FTR.) (shk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 03/24 11:15 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Behrens, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/25 12:46 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2025 01:00 PM CST before Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Parties are instructed to call 833-568-8864and enter Meeting ID 161 2255 6691#, Participant ID Passcode 252788#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 2/25/2025. (shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 order Order Tue 02/18 10:02 AM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 2/18/2025. (shk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/13 12:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint for Personal Injury, AD and JD by Hook-SupeRx, LLC.(Brunette, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/07 9:23 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Gretchen S Lund and Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke M Behrens on behalf of Hook-SupeRx, LLC dba CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Behrens, Brooke)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice - Other Thu 02/06 2:50 PM
NOTICE by Hook-SupeRx, LLC dba CVS Pharmacy, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, of Motions that Remain Pending in State Court (Brunette, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 2:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hook-SupeRx, LLC dba CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brunette, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas G Brunette on behalf of Hook-SupeRx, LLC dba CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Brunette, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/06 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5809551.) from Lake Superior Court, Civil Division 4, Cause No. 45D04-2412-CT-001405, filed by Hook-SupeRx, LLC dba CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Brunette, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 5 pgs cmp State Court Complaint Fri 02/07 9:19 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hook-SupeRx, LLC, filed by Jeannette Graham in Lake Superior Court 45D04-2412-CT-001405.(kmt)
Related: [-]