Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:25-cv-00136
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
defendant
Anna Stamper
defendant
Deborah Jones
defendant
Eileen Cannon
defendant
Kenneth McIntyre
defendant
Ruth Bartlett
defendant
Unknown Fosburg
plaintiff
Michael A. Fleming #802151

GPO Apr 10 2025
OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 11 pgs order Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM Thu 04/10 9:24 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to PEM: the 90-day service period is tolled; participating defendants to enter a limited appearance by May 15, 2025; w/attached PEM forms and Program Description; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order (Screening) Thu 04/10 9:23 AM
ORDER in accordance with opinion; granting IFP; dismissing claim(s) and party(ies); signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
4 4 24 pgs order Opinion (Screening) Thu 04/10 9:22 AM
OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/10 11:05 AM
Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM6 with complaint1 emailed to AG (eod)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/10 2:05 PM
Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM6 , Order5 and Opinion4 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael A. Fleming #802151 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
3 3 misc Receipt of Case Notice Thu 02/06 2:47 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Affidavit Thu 02/06 2:47 PM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Michael A. Fleming #802151 (ems)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand (signature as taken from 2 ) against Ruth Bartlett, Eileen Cannon, Unknown Fosburg, Deborah Jones, Kenneth McIntyre, Anna Stamper filed by Michael A. Fleming #802151 (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
misc Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case) Thu 02/06 2:46 PM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by plaintiff Michael A. Fleming #802151 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ems)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 02/06 2:48 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael A. Fleming #802151 (ems)
Related: [-]