Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:25-cv-00105
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 6:31 AM EDT
Defendant
MasTec Industrial Corp.
Plaintiff
Engie Buckeye Operations LLC
Represented By
F. Michael Stenglein
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Gregory Arthur Ruehlmann
King & Spalding
contact info
Luke Roniger
King & Spalding LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 1:46 PM
ORDER - This matter is before the Court Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (ECF No. 2.) Plaintiff is DIRECTED to email the Undersigneds Chambers with unredacted copies of all documents they seek to file under seal by MAY 1, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 25, 2025. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 5:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant MasTec Industrial Corp.. (Abrams, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 5:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Counter Claimant MasTec Industrial Corp.. (Abrams, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 04/24 4:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Engie Buckeye Operations LLC filed by MasTec Industrial Corp.. (Abrams, James)
Related: [-]
misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 10:58 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MasTec Inc for Defendant MasTec Industrial Corp. SEE DOCKET # 18 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to add the corporate parent information (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/23 5:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Motion to Dismiss and Answer/Counterclaim by Defendant MasTec Industrial Corp.. (Abrams, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 04/23 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2025 10:30 AM in Zoom Meeting before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Wed 04/23 11:24 AM
STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME by Defendant MasTec Industrial Corp.. (Abrams, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 1:48 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Minoru Suga and Joseph Scott Guarino. PHV counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER if they have not already done so. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/21/25. (ds)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 12:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Michael Minoru Suga and Joseph Scott Guarino by Defendant MasTec Industrial Corp.. (Roper, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Joseph S. Guarino,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Michael M. Suga,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Admission and Good Standing for Michael M. Suga,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Good Standing for Michael M. Suga
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Champlin Roper for Defendant MasTec Industrial Corp. (Roper, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Champlin Roper for Defendant MasTec Industrial Corp. (Roper, David)
Related: [-]
misc Pay Fees Via Pay.Gov Mon 04/21 12:54 PM
Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AOHSDC-10472130. (Roper, David)
Related: [-]
misc Pay Fees Via Pay.Gov Mon 04/21 12:57 PM
Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AOHSDC-10472148 - Related Document:11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Michael Minoru Suga and Joseph Scott Guarino filed by MasTec Industrial Corp... (Roper, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 4:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to MasTec Industrial Corp. on 2/6/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Stenglein, F.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 11:20 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting4 and5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mike Stenglein and Luke Roniger as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/7/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/07 11:09 AM
Summons Issued as to MasTec Industrial Corp. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/06 9:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10365845) of Luke Roniger by Plaintiff Engie Buckeye Operations LLC. (Ruehlmann, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing
4 4 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/06 9:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10365844) of Mike Stenglein by Plaintiff Engie Buckeye Operations LLC. (Ruehlmann, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/06 9:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Engie Buckeye Operations LLC, ENGIE Generation North America LLC, ENGIE North America Inc., Engie S.A. identifying Corporate Parent Engie S.A., Corporate Parent ENGIE Generation North America LLC, Corporate Parent ENGIE North America Inc. for Engie Buckeye Operations LLC.. (Ruehlmann, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion File Document Under Seal Thu 02/06 9:19 PM
MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff Engie Buckeye Operations LLC. (Ruehlmann, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/06 9:02 PM
COMPLAINT against MasTec Industrial Corp. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10365824), filed by Engie Buckeye Operations LLC. (Ruehlmann, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form Matec Industrial Corp.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Cover Sheet