Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher G Bradley
Case #: 3:25-bk-30156
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Mar 17, 2025
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025

Debtor
Dupont Analytics, LLC
2370 Enchanted Rock Ln
El Paso, TX 79911-7551
Represented By
Edgar J. Borrego
Tanzy & Borrego Law Offices, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212


Docket last updated: 02/07/2025 12:44 AM CST
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 26 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Thu 02/06 12:03 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Dupont Analytics, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 02/13/2025 (Borrego, Edgar)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Thu 02/06 12:06 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Edgar J. Borrego for Debtor Dupont Analytics, LLC. (Borrego, Edgar)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Dupont Analytics, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 02/13/2025
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 02/06 12:10 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Edgar J. Borrego for Debtor Dupont Analytics, LLC. (Borrego, Edgar)
Related: [-]
4 4 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Thu 02/06 12:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Osherow, Randolph N added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/17/2025 at 08:00 AM at Zoom - Osherow: Meeting ID 366 703 6877, Passcode 8572973665, OR call 210-675-8716. (Borrego, Edgar)
Related: [-]