New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:25-cv-01144
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2025
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Count of Union County, NJ, UNN-L-000047-25
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 6:37 AM EDT
Defendant
LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By
JASON STEWART NUNNERMACKER
Decotiis, Fitzpatrick, Cole & Giblin, LLP
contact info
WILLIAM J. HAMILTON
Decotiis, Fitzpatrick, Cole & Giblin, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PASMEL PROPERTY, INC.
Represented By
GLEN JOSEPH VIDA
Post Polak PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 03/04 9:42 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL with prejudice. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 3/3/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Fri 02/28 2:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (HAMILTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 02/19 10:21 AM
Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (HAMILTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Wed 02/19 9:50 AM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JASON STEWART NUNNERMACKER terminated. (NUNNERMACKER, JASON) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/19/2025) (wh, )
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 02/19 8:53 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/19/2025. (seb)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Wed 02/19 2:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The4 Notice of Withdrawal filed by JASON NUNNERMACKER on 2/19/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Thu 02/13 9:13 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 9:13 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a corporate disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Thu 02/13 9:31 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 Notice of Removal submitted filed by JASON NUNNERMACKER on 2/10/2025 contains only the signature of Attorney WILLIAM J. HAMILTON and does not indicate Mr. NUNNERMACKER as representing Defendant in this matter. If Mr. NUNNERMACKER does intend to represent Defendant in this case, kindly file a Notice of Appearance into this matter. If Mr. NUNNERMACKER does not intend to represent Defendant in this matter, kindly file a Notice of Withdrawal. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. HAMILTON on behalf of LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA, LLC (HAMILTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/11 4:37 PM
Case assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/10 5:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Union County, case number UNN-L-47-25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16009003), filed by LUKOIL NORTH AMERICA, LLC.(NUNNERMACKER, JASON)
Related: [-]