New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:25-cv-01235
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, BURLINGTON COUNTY, BUR-L-31-00025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:13 AM EDT
Defendant
AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE
Represented By
MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO
Robinson Miller LLC
contact info
BRADLEY ALAN SUITERS
Robinson Miller LLC
contact info
Defendant
CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO
Robinson Miller LLC
contact info
BRADLEY ALAN SUITERS
Robinson Miller LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AALIYAH HOUSTON
640 AMERICAN AVE E211
KING OF PRUSSIA, PA 19406


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 order Text Order Fri 04/25 11:16 AM
TEXT ORDER: A hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No.7 will be held before District Judge Edward S. Kiel on May 9, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. The hearing will be conducted by Teams video conference.[LINK:Click here to join the meeting] . Alternatively, the meeting ID is 228 511 066 404 0 and the passcode is ax3G7FQ3. Defendants are directed to promptly provide telephone and email notice to plaintiff of the hearing date and login credentials. So Ordered by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/25/2025. (gn, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Thu 04/24 11:50 AM
Letter from Michael J. Gesualdo, Esq. to Hon. Edward S. Kiel, U.S.D.J. re12 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion. (GESUALDO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Tue 04/22 4:16 PM
Memorandum Sur-Reply in Further Opposition filed by AALIYAH HOUSTON re7 MOTION to Dismiss (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 04/14 10:45 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES, INC. re7 MOTION to Dismiss (GESUALDO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Tue 04/08 11:58 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AALIYAH HOUSTON re7 MOTION to Dismiss(dmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
Monday, March 31, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 10:08 AM
LETTER ORDER Granting Plaintiff's request for a 10-day extension of time to file their response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/31/2025. (sms2, n.m.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Fri 03/28 4:10 PM
Letter addressed to Judge Kiel from AALIYAH HOUSTON Re: Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 03/05 2:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES, INC.. Responses due by 3/24/2025.(GESUALDO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael J. Gesualdo, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/05 5:00 PM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 02/20 9:06 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/6/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 02/19 1:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES, INC. identifying CarMax, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GESUALDO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 02/19 11:17 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SUITERS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Wed 02/19 11:05 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The4 Application filed by BRADLEY SUITERS on 2/18/2025 was submitted incorrectly using the motions event. Please be advised, for future filings, only formal motions are to be submitted using the Motions event. Please RESUBMIT the application using the event *Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/18 4:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (SUITERS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Fri 02/14 12:02 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (dmw, N.M. TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 10:07 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (dmw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 02/14 10:09 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmw, N.M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ALAN SUITERS on behalf of All Defendants (SUITERS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/13 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County, case number BUR-L-31-25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16017435), filed by AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, CARMAX AUTO SUPERSTORES, INC..(GESUALDO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/14 10:04 AM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)
Related: [-]